Texas 2017 85th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1152 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 04/18/2017

                    By: Menéndez, et al. S.B. No. 1152
 (In the Senate - Filed February 28, 2017; March 9, 2017,
 read first time and referred to Committee on Veteran Affairs &
 Border Security; April 18, 2017, reported favorably by the
 following vote:  Yeas 6, Nays 0; April 18, 2017, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to excused absences from public school for the purpose of
 pursuing enlistment in a branch of the armed services of the United
 States or the Texas National Guard.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 25.087, Education Code, is amended by
 adding Subsections (b-5) and (b-6) and amending Subsection (d) to
 read as follows:
 (b-5)  A school district shall excuse a student who is 17
 years of age or older from attending school to pursue enlistment in
 a branch of the armed services of the United States or the Texas
 National Guard, provided that:
 (1)  the district may not excuse for this purpose more
 than four days of school during the period the student is enrolled
 in high school; and
 (2)  the district verifies the student's activities
 related to pursuing enlistment in a branch of the armed services or
 the Texas National Guard.
 (b-6)  Each school district shall adopt procedures to verify
 a student's activities as described by Subsection (b-5).
 (d)  A student whose absence is excused under Subsection (b),
 (b-1), (b-2), (b-4), (b-5), or (c) may not be penalized for that
 absence and shall be counted as if the student attended school for
 purposes of calculating the average daily attendance of students in
 the school district.  A student whose absence is excused under
 Subsection (b), (b-1), (b-2), (b-4), (b-5), or (c) shall be allowed
 a reasonable time to make up school work missed on those days.  If
 the student satisfactorily completes the school work, the day of
 absence shall be counted as a day of compulsory attendance.
 SECTION 2.  This Act applies beginning with the 2017-2018
 school year.
 SECTION 3.  Not later than October 1, 2017, each school
 district shall adopt a policy for verification of student
 activities relating to pursuing military enlistment as required by
 Section 25.087(b-6), Education Code, as added by this Act.
 SECTION 4.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2017.
 * * * * *