Texas 2017 85th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1172 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 03/29/2017

                    By: Perry S.B. No. 1172
 (In the Senate - Filed March 1, 2017; March 9, 2017, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Agriculture, Water & Rural
 Affairs; March 29, 2017, reported favorably by the following vote:
 Yeas 6, Nays 0; March 29, 2017, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the regulation of seed by a political subdivision.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Chapter 61, Agriculture Code, is amended by
 adding Section 61.019 to read as follows:
 Sec. 61.019.  LOCAL REGULATION OF SEED PROHIBITED.
 (a)  Notwithstanding any other law and except as provided by
 Subsection (c), a political subdivision may not adopt an order,
 ordinance, or other measure that regulates agricultural seed,
 vegetable seed, weed seed, or any other seed in any manner,
 including planting seed or cultivating plants grown from seed.
 (b)  An order, ordinance, or other measure adopted by a
 political subdivision that violates Subsection (a) is void.
 (c)  A political subdivision may take any action otherwise
 prohibited by this section to:
 (1)  comply with any federal or state requirements;
 (2)  avoid a federal or state penalty or fine; or
 (3)  attain or maintain compliance with federal or
 state environmental standards, including state water quality
 standards.
 SECTION 2.  Section 61.019(b), Agriculture Code, as added by
 this Act, applies to an order, ordinance, or other measure adopted
 before, on, or after the effective date of this Act.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2017.
 * * * * *