Texas 2017 85th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1172 Enrolled / Bill

Filed 05/29/2017

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    S.B. No. 1172


 AN ACT
 relating to the regulation of seed by a political subdivision.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Chapter 61, Agriculture Code, is amended by
 adding Section 61.019 to read as follows:
 Sec. 61.019.  LOCAL REGULATION OF SEED PROHIBITED.
 (a)  Notwithstanding any other law and except as provided by
 Subsection (c), a political subdivision may not adopt an order,
 ordinance, or other measure that regulates agricultural seed,
 vegetable seed, weed seed, or any other seed in any manner,
 including planting seed or cultivating plants grown from seed.
 (b)  An order, ordinance, or other measure adopted by a
 political subdivision that violates Subsection (a) is void.
 (c)  A political subdivision may take any action otherwise
 prohibited by this section to:
 (1)  comply with any federal or state requirements;
 (2)  avoid a federal or state penalty or fine;
 (3)  attain or maintain compliance with federal or
 state environmental standards, including state water quality
 standards; or
 (4)  implement a:
 (A)  water conservation plan;
 (B)  drought contingency plan; or
 (C)  voluntary program as part of a conservation
 water management strategy included in the applicable regional water
 plan or state water plan.
 (d)  Nothing in this section preempts or otherwise limits the
 authority of any county or municipality to adopt and enforce zoning
 regulations, fire codes, building codes, storm water regulations,
 nuisance regulations as authorized by Section 342.004, Health and
 Safety Code, or waste disposal restrictions.
 SECTION 2.  Section 61.019(b), Agriculture Code, as added by
 this Act, applies to an order, ordinance, or other measure adopted
 before, on, or after the effective date of this Act.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2017.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 1172 passed the Senate on
 April 3, 2017, by the following vote:  Yeas 30, Nays 1;
 May 25, 2017, Senate refused to concur in House amendments and
 requested appointment of Conference Committee; May 26, 2017, House
 granted request of the Senate; May 28, 2017, Senate adopted
 Conference Committee Report by the following vote:  Yeas 27,
 Nays 3.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 1172 passed the House, with
 amendments, on May 22, 2017, by the following vote:  Yeas 135,
 Nays 10, two present not voting; May 26, 2017, House granted
 request of the Senate for appointment of Conference Committee;
 May 28, 2017, House adopted Conference Committee Report by the
 following vote:  Yeas 145, Nays 0, one present not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 Approved:
 ______________________________
 Date
 ______________________________
 Governor