Texas 2017 85th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1187 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: West S.B. No. 1187
 (In the Senate - Filed March 1, 2017; March 9, 2017, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Transportation;
 April 12, 2017, reported favorably by the following vote:  Yeas 9,
 Nays 0; April 12, 2017, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the offense of operating a motor vehicle without
 financial responsibility.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 601.053(c), Transportation Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 (c)  Subsection (b) does not apply if the peace officer
 determines through use of the verification program established
 under Subchapter N that financial responsibility has been
 established for the vehicle. A [If a] peace [officer has access to
 the verification program, the] officer may not issue a citation for
 an offense under [a violation of] Section 601.191 [601.051] unless
 the officer attempts to verify through the verification program
 that financial responsibility has been established for the vehicle
 and is unable to make that verification.
 SECTION 2.  Section 601.191, Transportation Code, is amended
 by adding Subsection (e) to read as follows:
 (e)  A citation issued for an offense under this section must
 include an affirmative indication that the peace officer was unable
 at the time of the alleged offense to verify financial
 responsibility for the vehicle through the verification program
 established under Subchapter N.
 SECTION 3.  Section 708.103, Transportation Code, is amended
 by amending Subsection (a) and adding Subsection (a-1) to read as
 follows:
 (a)  Except as provided by Subsection (a-1), each [Each] year
 the department shall assess a surcharge on the license of each
 person who during the preceding 36-month period has been convicted
 of an offense under Section 521.457, 601.191, or 601.371.
 (a-1)  The department may not assess a surcharge on the
 license of a person based on an offense under Section 601.191 if the
 person proves to the department under Section 601.231(b) that the
 person had financial responsibility at the time the offense was
 alleged to have occurred.
 SECTION 4.  The change in law made by this Act to Section
 708.103, Transportation Code, applies to a surcharge pending on the
 effective date of this Act, regardless of when the surcharge was
 assessed.
 SECTION 5.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2017.
 * * * * *