Texas 2017 85th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1215 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Hughes S.B. No. 1215
 (In the Senate - Filed March 2, 2017; March 9, 2017, read
 first time and referred to Committee on State Affairs;
 April 12, 2017, reported adversely, with favorable Committee
 Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 8, Nays 1; April 12, 2017,
 sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 1215 By:  Hughes


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to responsibility for the consequences of defects in the
 plans, specifications, or related documents for the construction or
 repair of an improvement to real property.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Title 4, Business & Commerce Code, is amended by
 adding Chapter 59 to read as follows:
 CHAPTER 59.  RESPONSIBILITY FOR DEFECTS IN PLANS AND
 SPECIFICATIONS
 Sec. 59.001.  APPLICABILITY.  This chapter applies only to a
 contract for the construction or repair of an improvement to real
 property.
 Sec. 59.002.  DEFINITION. In this chapter, "contractor"
 means a person required to perform work under a contract.
 Sec. 59.003.  CONTRACTOR NOT RESPONSIBLE FOR CERTAIN
 DEFECTS. A contractor is not responsible for the consequences of
 defects in and may not warranty the accuracy, adequacy,
 sufficiency, or suitability of plans, specifications, or other
 design or bid documents provided to the contractor by:
 (1)  the person with whom the contractor entered into
 the contract; or
 (2)  another person on behalf of the person with whom
 the contractor entered into the contract.
 Sec. 59.004.  WAIVER OF CHAPTER PROHIBITED. A person may not
 waive this chapter by any means.  A purported waiver of this chapter
 is void.
 SECTION 2.  (a)  The changes in law made by this Act apply
 only to a contract for the construction or repair of an improvement
 to real property entered into on or after the effective date of this
 Act. A contract entered into before the effective date of this Act
 is governed by the law in effect when the contract was entered into,
 and the former law is continued in effect for that purpose.
 (b)  An original contract for the construction or repair of
 an improvement to real property with the owner of an interest in
 real property that is entered into before the effective date of this
 Act, and a subcontract or purchase order for providing labor or
 materials associated with that original contract, whether the
 subcontract or purchase order is entered into before, on, or after
 the effective date of this Act, is governed by the law in effect
 when the original contract was entered into, and the former law is
 continued in effect for that purpose.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2017.
 * * * * *