Texas 2017 85th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1215 Enrolled / Bill

Filed 05/27/2017

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    S.B. No. 1215


 AN ACT
 relating to the creation of a joint interim committee to study
 issues related to construction contracts.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  JOINT INTERIM COMMITTEE. (a)  A joint interim
 committee is created to conduct a study under Section 2 of this Act.
 (b)  The joint interim committee is composed of members of
 the appropriate standing committees of the senate and the house of
 representatives as determined by the lieutenant governor and the
 speaker of the house of representatives.
 (c)  The lieutenant governor and speaker of the house of
 representatives shall each designate a co-chair from among the
 joint interim committee members, and the joint interim committee
 shall convene at the joint call of the co-chairs.
 (d)  The joint interim committee has all other powers and
 duties provided to a special or select committee by the rules of the
 senate and house of representatives, by Subchapter B, Chapter 301,
 Government Code, and by policies of the senate and house committees
 on administration.
 SECTION 2.  INTERIM STUDY. (a)  The joint interim committee
 shall conduct a study on issues relating to construction contracts
 in this state to the extent the committee determines appropriate.
 Those issues may include:
 (1)  the allocation of liability among persons involved
 in a construction project;
 (2)  relationships among parties to construction
 contracts, including property owners, general contractors,
 subcontractors, and design professionals;
 (3)  liens on real property arising from construction
 contracts;
 (4)  indemnification and insurance issues;
 (5)  warranties;
 (6)  standards of care for persons involved in
 construction projects; and
 (7)  civil actions and other forms of dispute
 resolution arising from construction defects and remedies for
 construction defects.
 (b)  Not later than December 1, 2018, the joint interim
 committee shall issue a report on the study required under this
 section to the lieutenant governor, the speaker of the house of
 representatives, and the appropriate standing committees of the
 house of representatives and the senate.
 SECTION 3.  EXPIRATION. The joint interim committee created
 under Section 1 of this Act is abolished and this Act expires
 September 1, 2019.
 SECTION 4.  EFFECTIVE DATE. This Act takes effect
 immediately if it receives a vote of two-thirds of all the members
 elected to each house, as provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas
 Constitution. If this Act does not receive the vote necessary for
 immediate effect, this Act takes effect September 1, 2017.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 1215 passed the Senate on
 April 19, 2017, by the following vote: Yeas 29, Nays 2; and that
 the Senate concurred in House amendments on May 27, 2017, by the
 following vote: Yeas 28, Nays 3.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 1215 passed the House, with
 amendments, on May 24, 2017, by the following vote: Yeas 77,
 Nays 69, one present not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 Approved:
 ______________________________
 Date
 ______________________________
 Governor