Texas 2017 85th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1229 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 03/30/2017

                    By: Menéndez S.B. No. 1229
 (In the Senate - Filed March 2, 2017; March 9, 2017, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Intergovernmental
 Relations; March 30, 2017, reported adversely, with favorable
 Committee Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 7, Nays 0;
 March 30, 2017, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 1229 By:  Menéndez


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to solid waste services for rental property and solid
 waste management programs in the extraterritorial jurisdiction of
 municipalities in certain counties; authorizing penalties.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 364.011, Health and Safety Code, is
 amended by adding Subsection (a-1) to read as follows:
 (a-1)  Notwithstanding Subsection (a), a commissioners court
 may, through a competitive bidding process, contract for the
 provision of solid waste collection, handling, storage, and
 disposal in an area of the county located within the
 extraterritorial jurisdiction of a municipality if:
 (1)  the municipality does not provide solid waste
 disposal services in that area; and
 (2)  the county has a population of more than 1.5
 million and at least 75 percent of the population resides in a
 single municipality.
 SECTION 2.  Section 364.034, Health and Safety Code, is
 amended by amending Subsection (a) and adding Subsections (a-1) and
 (a-2) to read as follows:
 (a)  A public agency or a county may:
 (1)  offer solid waste disposal service to persons in
 its territory, including, in the case of a county described by
 Section 364.011(a-1)(2), an area of the county located within the
 extraterritorial jurisdiction of a municipality if the
 municipality does not provide solid waste disposal services in that
 area;
 (2)  require the use of the service by those persons,
 except as provided by Subsection (a-1);
 (3)  charge fees for the service; and
 (4)  establish the service as a utility separate from
 other utilities in its territory.
 (a-1)  Notwithstanding Subsection (a)(2), a person is not
 required to use solid waste disposal services offered by a county to
 persons in an area of the county located within the
 extraterritorial jurisdiction of a municipality that does not
 provide solid waste disposal services in that area if:
 (1)  the person contracts for solid waste disposal
 services with a provider that meets rules adopted by the commission
 for the regulation of solid waste disposal; or
 (2)  the person is a private entity that contracts to
 provide temporary solid waste disposal services to a construction
 site or project by furnishing a roll-off container used to
 transport construction waste or demolition debris to a facility for
 disposal or recycling.
 (a-2)  Subsection (a-1) does not affect the authority of a
 governmental entity to pursue actions under Subchapter B, Chapter
 365, to address illegal dumping.
 SECTION 3.  Subchapter C, Chapter 791, Government Code, is
 amended by adding Section 791.037 to read as follows:
 Sec. 791.037.  SOLID WASTE DISPOSAL SERVICES IN CERTAIN
 COUNTIES. (a)  In this section, "solid waste" has the meaning
 assigned by Section 361.003, Health and Safety Code.
 (b)  This section applies only to a county with a population
 of more than 1.5 million in which more than 75 percent of the
 population resides in a single municipality.
 (c)  A county may contract with a municipality to provide,
 directly or through a contract with another entity, a mandatory
 program under Section 364.034, Health and Safety Code, for solid
 waste disposal services in an area of the county located within the
 extraterritorial jurisdiction of the municipality if the
 municipality does not provide solid waste disposal services in that
 area.
 (d)  A contract under this section must include provisions
 regarding the termination of the county's provision of service on
 the occurrence of certain contingencies, including the annexation
 of the area covered by the contract by the municipality or the
 provision of service to the area by the municipality.
 SECTION 4.  Subchapter A, Chapter 92, Property Code, is
 amended by adding Section 92.0071 to read as follows:
 Sec. 92.0071.  SOLID WASTE SERVICES REQUIRED IN CERTAIN
 AREAS OF CERTAIN COUNTIES. (a)  In this section, "garbage" and
 "rubbish" have the meanings assigned by Section 361.003, Health and
 Safety Code.
 (b)  This section applies only to a county with a population
 of more than 1.5 million in which at least 75 percent of the
 population resides in a single municipality.
 (c)  A landlord of two or more leased dwellings located in
 the extraterritorial jurisdiction of a municipality located in the
 county must:
 (1)  notify the county that the landlord has two or more
 leased dwellings located in the extraterritorial jurisdiction of
 the municipality and provide the addresses of the dwellings and the
 landlord to the county; and
 (2)  provide solid waste services for the collection,
 transportation, and disposal of garbage and rubbish from each
 dwelling by using the solid waste disposal services offered by the
 county, if any, or by contracting for the services with a provider
 that meets rules adopted by the Texas Commission on Environmental
 Quality for the regulation of solid waste disposal.
 (d)  On request by the county, the landlord must provide the
 county with documentation showing that solid waste services for
 each dwelling are being provided.
 (e)  A provision of a lease that purports to waive a right or
 to exempt a party from a liability or duty under this section is
 void.
 (f)  The commissioners court of the county may adopt orders
 to enforce this section, including an order establishing a civil or
 administrative penalty.
 SECTION 5.  (a)  Except as provided by Subsection (b) of
 this section, this Act takes effect immediately if it receives a
 vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2017.
 (b)  Section 92.0071, Property Code, as added by this Act,
 takes effect January 1, 2018.
 * * * * *