Texas 2017 85th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1246 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Rodríguez S.B. No. 1246
 (In the Senate - Filed March 3, 2017; March 13, 2017, read
 first time and referred to Committee on State Affairs;
 April 12, 2017, reported adversely, with favorable Committee
 Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 7, Nays 2; April 12, 2017,
 sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 1246 By:  Schwertner


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the salary of a bailiff in El Paso County.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Sections 53.0091(a), (b), and (d), Government
 Code, are amended to read as follows:
 (a)  Each bailiff appointed under Section 53.002(c) shall be
 paid an annual salary out of the general fund of El Paso County,
 unless another source of funding is approved by the commissioners
 court.  The council of judges shall set the salary in writing
 consistent with pay scales adopted by the commissioners court that
 are comparable to other positions within El Paso County. [The
 appointing judge shall set the salary in writing, but except as
 otherwise provided by this section, the annual salary shall be set
 at $18,000 on August 26, 1985, and thereafter the $18,000 annual
 salary shall increase as provided by Subsection (c).]
 (b)  Bailiffs appointed under Section 53.002(c) who held
 office as bailiffs under that section [Chapter 817, Acts of the 62nd
 Legislature, Regular Session, 1971 (Article 2292l, Vernon's Texas
 Civil Statutes), or under Chapter 532, Acts of the 67th
 Legislature, Regular Session, 1981 (Article 2292o, Vernon's Texas
 Civil Statutes),] on June 30, 2017 [August 25, 1985], are entitled
 to receive at least the same annual salary or compensation under
 this section as they received [under those Acts] on that date
 [August 26, 1985].
 (d)  A person appointed to succeed a bailiff who held office
 as bailiff under Section 53.002(c) [Chapter 817, Acts of the 62nd
 Legislature, Regular Session, 1971 (Article 2292l, Vernon's Texas
 Civil Statutes), or under Chapter 532, Acts of the 67th
 Legislature, Regular Session, 1981 (Article 2292o, Vernon's Texas
 Civil Statutes),] is not entitled to be paid the same annual salary
 paid to the bailiff the person [he] succeeds, but is entitled to
 receive an annual salary as provided by Subsection (a) [the annual
 salary as provided by this section so that the bailiffs' salaries
 under this section will become uniform with the passage of time. A
 person appointed to succeed any bailiff before October 1, 1986, is
 entitled to the $18,000 annual salary set by Subsection (a). A
 person appointed to succeed any bailiff on or after October 1, 1986,
 is entitled to the $18,000 annual salary set by Subsection (a) or
 the salary set on the date the bailiff is appointed for a Grade 20 of
 the El Paso County Job Guide Designation for a new employee under
 Grade 20, whichever is greater. A bailiff whose annual salary is
 set on September 30, 1986, at $18,000 under this section is on
 October 1, 1986, entitled to any salary increase provided for under
 Subsection (c) or the salary set on October 1, 1986, for a Grade 20
 of the El Paso County Job Guide Designation for a new employee under
 Grade 20, whichever is greater. After October 1, 1986, all salary
 increases for bailiffs shall be uniform as provided for in
 Subsection (c). If a substantial number of those job titles or
 positions listed on the effective date of this section under Grade
 20 of the El Paso County Job Guide Designation are removed from
 Grade 20 or the El Paso County Job Guide Designation is replaced
 with some other system for setting employees' salaries under those
 job titles or positions listed under Grade 20 of the El Paso County
 Job Guide Designation, on the date a new bailiff is appointed, the
 starting salary being paid at that time by El Paso County to the
 functional equivalent of Grade 20 of the El Paso County Job Guide
 Designation shall be used in place of Grade 20. In determining the
 functional equivalent of Grade 20 under this section, the job
 titles, positions, or their equivalent listed under Grade 20 on
 August 26, 1985, shall be considered as the only factors].
 SECTION 2.  Sections 53.0091(c) and (e), Government Code,
 are repealed.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2017.
 * * * * *