Texas 2017 85th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1249 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: West S.B. No. 1249
 (In the Senate - Filed March 3, 2017; March 13, 2017, read
 first time and referred to Committee on State Affairs;
 April 3, 2017, reported favorably by the following vote:  Yeas 9,
 Nays 0; April 3, 2017, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to adverse possession of real property by a cotenant heir
 against other cotenant heirs.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter B, Chapter 16, Civil Practice and
 Remedies Code, is amended by adding Section 16.0265 to read as
 follows:
 Sec. 16.0265.  ADVERSE POSSESSION BY COTENANT HEIR: 15-YEAR
 COMBINED LIMITATIONS PERIOD. (a)  In this section, "cotenant heir"
 means one of two or more persons who simultaneously acquire
 identical, undivided ownership interests in, and rights to
 possession of, the same real property by operation of the
 applicable intestate succession laws of this state or a successor
 in interest of one of those persons.
 (b)  One or more cotenant heirs of real property may acquire
 the interests of other cotenant heirs in the property by adverse
 possession under this section if, for a continuous, uninterrupted
 10-year period immediately preceding the filing of the affidavits
 required by Subsection (c):
 (1)  the possessing cotenant heir or heirs:
 (A)  hold the property in peaceable and exclusive
 possession;
 (B)  cultivate, use, or enjoy the property; and
 (C)  pay all property taxes on the property not
 later than two years after the date the taxes become due; and
 (2)  no other cotenant heir has:
 (A)  contributed to the property's taxes or
 maintenance;
 (B)  challenged a possessing cotenant heir's
 exclusive possession of the property;
 (C)  asserted any other claim against a possessing
 cotenant heir in connection with the property, such as the right to
 rental payments from a possessing cotenant heir;
 (D)  acted to preserve the cotenant heir's
 interest in the property by filing notice of the cotenant heir's
 claimed interest in the deed records of the county in which the
 property is located; or
 (E)  entered into a written agreement with the
 possessing cotenant heir under which the possessing cotenant heir
 is allowed to possess the property but the other cotenant heir does
 not forfeit that heir's ownership interest.
 (c)  To make a claim of adverse possession against a cotenant
 heir under this section, the cotenant heir or heirs claiming
 adverse possession must:
 (1)  file in the deed records of the county in which the
 real property is located an affidavit of heirship in the form
 prescribed by Section 203.002, Estates Code, and an affidavit of
 adverse possession that complies with the requirements of
 Subsection (d);
 (2)  publish notice of the claim in a newspaper of
 general circulation in the county in which the property is located
 for the four consecutive weeks immediately following the date the
 affidavits required by Subdivision (1) are filed; and
 (3)  provide written notice of the claim to the last
 known addresses of all other cotenant heirs by certified mail,
 return receipt requested.
 (d)  The affidavits required by Subsection (c) may be filed
 separately or combined into a single instrument.  The affidavit of
 adverse possession must include:
 (1)  a legal description of the property that is the
 subject of the adverse possession;
 (2)  an attestation that each affiant is a cotenant
 heir of the property who has been in peaceable and exclusive
 possession of the property for a continuous, uninterrupted period
 during the 10 years preceding the filing of the affidavit;
 (3)  an attestation of cultivation, use, or enjoyment
 of the property by each affiant during the 10 years preceding the
 filing of the affidavit;
 (4)  evidence of payment by the affiant or affiants of
 all property taxes on the property as provided by Subsection (b)
 during the 10 years preceding the filing of the affidavit; and
 (5)  an attestation that there has been no action
 described by Subsection (b)(2) by another cotenant heir during the
 10 years preceding the filing of the affidavit.
 (e)  A cotenant heir must file a controverting affidavit or
 bring suit to recover the cotenant heir's interest in real property
 adversely possessed by another cotenant heir under this section not
 later than the fifth anniversary of the date a right of adverse
 possession is asserted by the filing of the affidavits required by
 Subsection (c).
 (f)  If a controverting affidavit or judgment is not filed
 before the fifth anniversary of the date the affidavits required by
 Subsection (c) are filed and no notice described by Subsection
 (b)(2)(D) was filed in the 10-year period preceding the filing of
 the affidavits under Subsection (c), title vests in the adversely
 possessing cotenant heir or heirs in the manner provided by Section
 16.030, precluding all claims by other cotenant heirs.
 (g)  A bona fide lender for value without notice accepting a
 voluntary lien against the real property to secure the adversely
 possessing cotenant heir's indebtedness or a bona fide purchaser
 for value without notice may conclusively rely on the affidavits
 required by Subsection (c) if:
 (1)  the affidavits have been filed of record for the
 period prescribed by Subsection (e); and
 (2)  a controverting affidavit or judgment has not been
 filed during that period.
 (h)  Without a title instrument, peaceable and adverse
 possession is limited in this section to 160 acres, including
 improvements, unless the number of acres actually enclosed exceeds
 160 acres. If the number of enclosed acres exceeds 160 acres,
 peaceable and adverse possession extends to the real property
 actually enclosed.
 (i)  Peaceable possession of real property held under a duly
 registered deed or other memorandum of title that fixes the
 boundaries of the possessor's claim extends to the boundaries
 specified in the instrument.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2017.
 * * * * *