Texas 2017 85th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1250 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: West S.B. No. 1250
 (In the Senate - Filed March 3, 2017; March 13, 2017, read
 first time and referred to Committee on State Affairs;
 April 3, 2017, reported favorably by the following vote:  Yeas 9,
 Nays 0; April 3, 2017, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the admissibility of certain evidence in the
 prosecution of certain offenses involving family violence.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Article 38.371(a), Code of Criminal Procedure,
 is amended to read as follows:
 (a)  This article applies to a proceeding in the prosecution
 of a defendant for an offense, or for an attempt or conspiracy to
 commit an offense, that is committed under:
 (1)  Section 22.01, [or] 22.02, or 22.04, Penal Code,
 against a person whose relationship to or association with the
 defendant is described by Section 71.0021(b), 71.003, or 71.005,
 Family Code; or
 (2)  Section 25.07 or 25.072, Penal Code, if the
 offense is based on a violation of an order or a condition of bond in
 a case involving family violence.
 SECTION 2.  The change in law made by this Act applies to the
 admissibility of evidence in a criminal proceeding that commences
 on or after the effective date of this Act.  The admissibility of
 evidence in a criminal proceeding that commences before the
 effective date of this Act is governed by the law in effect on the
 date the proceeding commenced, and the former law is continued in
 effect for that purpose.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2017.
 * * * * *