By: Miles, Whitmire S.B. No. 1269 (In the Senate - Filed March 3, 2017; March 13, 2017, read first time and referred to Committee on Agriculture, Water & Rural Affairs; April 6, 2017, reported adversely, with favorable Committee Substitute by the following vote: Yeas 7, Nays 0; April 6, 2017, sent to printer.) Click here to see the committee vote COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 1269 By: Perry A BILL TO BE ENTITLED AN ACT relating to the establishment of a task force to conduct a comprehensive study on flood control infrastructure for Harris and Galveston Counties. BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: SECTION 1. (a) In this section, "task force" means the task force on flood control infrastructure established under this section. (b) The task force is established to conduct a comprehensive flood control infrastructure study for Harris and Galveston Counties. The study must: (1) assess the existing infrastructure in Harris and Galveston Counties with respect to flood control; and (2) identify infrastructure improvements necessary to mitigate flooding in those counties. (c) The task force is composed of 12 members as follows: (1) one person appointed by the governor; (2) one person appointed by the lieutenant governor; (3) one person appointed by the speaker of the house of representatives; (4) two representatives of the University of Houston's Hobby School of Public Affairs or Cullen College of Engineering, one of whom is appointed by the author of this Act and one of whom is appointed by the sponsor of this Act; (5) two representatives of Texas Southern University's Barbara Jordan-Mickey Leland School of Public Affairs or Department of Transportation Studies, one of whom is appointed by the author of this Act and one of whom is appointed by the sponsor of this Act; (6) one representative of the mayor of the City of Houston, appointed by the mayor; (7) one representative of the Harris County Commissioners Court, appointed by the commissioners court; (8) one representative of the Galveston County Commissioners Court, appointed by the commissioners court; (9) one other person appointed by the author of this Act; and (10) one other person appointed by the sponsor of this Act. (d) One member appointed under Subsection (c)(4) of this section serves as the presiding officer of the task force, and one member appointed under Subsection (c)(5) of this section serves as the assistant presiding officer. (e) The Hobby School of Public Affairs and the Cullen College of Engineering of the University of Houston shall provide necessary staff and administrative support to the task force. (f) The Harris County Flood Control District shall serve as an advisor to the task force by reviewing task force work products and providing data and other information necessary to conduct the study. (g) The task force shall prepare a report that includes: (1) a description of the activities of the task force; (2) the findings and recommendations of the task force, including any proposed policy recommendations; and (3) any proposals for legislation or other matters the task force considers appropriate. (h) Not later than December 1, 2018, the task force shall submit the report prepared under this section to: (1) the governor; (2) the lieutenant governor; (3) the speaker of the house of representatives; and (4) the presiding officers of the standing committees of the senate and house of representatives having primary jurisdiction over issues relating to flood control infrastructure. (i) The task force is abolished and this Act expires January 1, 2019. SECTION 2. This Act does not make an appropriation. A provision of this Act that imposes a new duty on a governmental entity is not mandatory during a fiscal period for which the legislature has not made a specific appropriation to implement the provision. SECTION 3. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this Act takes effect September 1, 2017. * * * * *