Texas 2017 85th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1269 Engrossed / Fiscal Note

Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    LEGISLATIVE BUDGET BOARD    Austin, Texas      FISCAL NOTE, 85TH LEGISLATIVE REGULAR SESSION            May 5, 2017      TO: Honorable Lyle Larson, Chair, House Committee on Natural Resources      FROM: Ursula Parks, Director, Legislative Budget Board     IN RE:SB1269 by Miles (Relating to the establishment of a task force to conduct a comprehensive study on flood control infrastructure for Harris and Galveston Counties.), As Engrossed    No significant fiscal implication to the State is anticipated.  The bill would amend statute to establish a task force to conduct a comprehensive study on flood control infrastructure for Harris and Galveston Counties. The bill would appoint two representatives from the University of Houston's Hobby School of Public Affairs or the Cullen College of Engineering and Texas Southern University's Barbara Jordan-Mickey Leland School of Public Affairs or Department of Transportation Studies. The bill would require the Hobby School of Public Affairs and the Cullen College of Engineering at the University of Houston provide necessary staff and administrative support to the task force. The bill would require the task force to submit a report to the Legislature and the Governor no later than December 1, 2018.The bill would take effect immediately upon a two-thirds vote from all members of each house or, if such a vote is not received, on September 1, 2017. The task force would be abolished and the bill expire January 1, 2019.The institutions noted there would be costs associated with the bill, however, this analysis assumes implementation of the legislation can be accomplished within existing resources. Local Government Impact No significant fiscal implication to units of local government is anticipated.    Source Agencies:717 Texas Southern University, 783 University of Houston System Administration   LBB Staff:  UP, JP, SZ, DEH, JGA    

LEGISLATIVE BUDGET BOARD
Austin, Texas
FISCAL NOTE, 85TH LEGISLATIVE REGULAR SESSION
May 5, 2017





  TO: Honorable Lyle Larson, Chair, House Committee on Natural Resources      FROM: Ursula Parks, Director, Legislative Budget Board     IN RE:SB1269 by Miles (Relating to the establishment of a task force to conduct a comprehensive study on flood control infrastructure for Harris and Galveston Counties.), As Engrossed  

TO: Honorable Lyle Larson, Chair, House Committee on Natural Resources
FROM: Ursula Parks, Director, Legislative Budget Board
IN RE: SB1269 by Miles (Relating to the establishment of a task force to conduct a comprehensive study on flood control infrastructure for Harris and Galveston Counties.), As Engrossed

 Honorable Lyle Larson, Chair, House Committee on Natural Resources 

 Honorable Lyle Larson, Chair, House Committee on Natural Resources 

 Ursula Parks, Director, Legislative Budget Board

 Ursula Parks, Director, Legislative Budget Board

SB1269 by Miles (Relating to the establishment of a task force to conduct a comprehensive study on flood control infrastructure for Harris and Galveston Counties.), As Engrossed

SB1269 by Miles (Relating to the establishment of a task force to conduct a comprehensive study on flood control infrastructure for Harris and Galveston Counties.), As Engrossed



No significant fiscal implication to the State is anticipated.

No significant fiscal implication to the State is anticipated.



The bill would amend statute to establish a task force to conduct a comprehensive study on flood control infrastructure for Harris and Galveston Counties. The bill would appoint two representatives from the University of Houston's Hobby School of Public Affairs or the Cullen College of Engineering and Texas Southern University's Barbara Jordan-Mickey Leland School of Public Affairs or Department of Transportation Studies. The bill would require the Hobby School of Public Affairs and the Cullen College of Engineering at the University of Houston provide necessary staff and administrative support to the task force. The bill would require the task force to submit a report to the Legislature and the Governor no later than December 1, 2018.The bill would take effect immediately upon a two-thirds vote from all members of each house or, if such a vote is not received, on September 1, 2017. The task force would be abolished and the bill expire January 1, 2019.The institutions noted there would be costs associated with the bill, however, this analysis assumes implementation of the legislation can be accomplished within existing resources.

Local Government Impact

No significant fiscal implication to units of local government is anticipated.

Source Agencies: 717 Texas Southern University, 783 University of Houston System Administration

717 Texas Southern University, 783 University of Houston System Administration

LBB Staff: UP, JP, SZ, DEH, JGA

 UP, JP, SZ, DEH, JGA