Texas 2017 85th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1269 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 04/06/2017

                    By: Miles, Whitmire S.B. No. 1269
 (In the Senate - Filed March 3, 2017; March 13, 2017, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Agriculture, Water & Rural
 Affairs; April 6, 2017, reported adversely, with favorable
 Committee Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 7, Nays 0;
 April 6, 2017, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 1269 By:  Perry


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the establishment of a task force to conduct a
 comprehensive study on flood control infrastructure for Harris and
 Galveston Counties.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  (a)  In this section, "task force" means the
 task force on flood control infrastructure established under this
 section.
 (b)  The task force is established to conduct a comprehensive
 flood control infrastructure study for Harris and Galveston
 Counties. The study must:
 (1)  assess the existing infrastructure in Harris and
 Galveston Counties with respect to flood control; and
 (2)  identify infrastructure improvements necessary to
 mitigate flooding in those counties.
 (c)  The task force is composed of 12 members as follows:
 (1)  one person appointed by the governor;
 (2)  one person appointed by the lieutenant governor;
 (3)  one person appointed by the speaker of the house of
 representatives;
 (4)  two representatives of the University of Houston's
 Hobby School of Public Affairs or Cullen College of Engineering,
 one of whom is appointed by the author of this Act and one of whom is
 appointed by the sponsor of this Act;
 (5)  two representatives of Texas Southern University's
 Barbara Jordan-Mickey Leland School of Public Affairs or Department
 of Transportation Studies, one of whom is appointed by the author of
 this Act and one of whom is appointed by the sponsor of this Act;
 (6)  one representative of the mayor of the City of
 Houston, appointed by the mayor;
 (7)  one representative of the Harris County
 Commissioners Court, appointed by the commissioners court;
 (8)  one representative of the Galveston County
 Commissioners Court, appointed by the commissioners court;
 (9)  one other person appointed by the author of this
 Act; and
 (10)  one other person appointed by the sponsor of this
 Act.
 (d)  One member appointed under Subsection (c)(4) of this
 section serves as the presiding officer of the task force, and one
 member appointed under Subsection (c)(5) of this section serves as
 the assistant presiding officer.
 (e)  The Hobby School of Public Affairs and the Cullen
 College of Engineering of the University of Houston shall provide
 necessary staff and administrative support to the task force.
 (f)  The Harris County Flood Control District shall serve as
 an advisor to the task force by reviewing task force work products
 and providing data and other information necessary to conduct the
 study.
 (g)  The task force shall prepare a report that includes:
 (1)  a description of the activities of the task force;
 (2)  the findings and recommendations of the task
 force, including any proposed policy recommendations; and
 (3)  any proposals for legislation or other matters the
 task force considers appropriate.
 (h)  Not later than December 1, 2018, the task force shall
 submit the report prepared under this section to:
 (1)  the governor;
 (2)  the lieutenant governor;
 (3)  the speaker of the house of representatives; and
 (4)  the presiding officers of the standing committees
 of the senate and house of representatives having primary
 jurisdiction over issues relating to flood control infrastructure.
 (i)  The task force is abolished and this Act expires January
 1, 2019.
 SECTION 2.  This Act does not make an appropriation. A
 provision of this Act that imposes a new duty on a governmental
 entity is not mandatory during a fiscal period for which the
 legislature has not made a specific appropriation to implement the
 provision.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2017.
 * * * * *