Texas 2017 85th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB128 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 03/27/2017

                    By: Garcia S.B. No. 128
 (In the Senate - Filed November 14, 2016; January 25, 2017,
 read first time and referred to Committee on Transportation;
 March 27, 2017, reported adversely, with favorable Committee
 Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 9, Nays 0; March 27, 2017,
 sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 128 By:  Garcia


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the inclusion of education and training regarding human
 trafficking in the curriculum of commercial driver's license
 training programs offered by public junior colleges and career
 schools and colleges and to certain requirements for commercial
 driver's licenses.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter A, Chapter 130, Education Code, is
 amended by adding Section 130.0105 to read as follows:
 Sec. 130.0105.  COMMERCIAL DRIVER'S LICENSE TRAINING
 PROGRAM; CERTAIN CURRICULUM REQUIREMENTS.  (a)  The Texas Higher
 Education Coordinating Board by rule shall require each public
 junior college offering a commercial driver's license training
 program to include as a part of that program education and training
 on the recognition and prevention of human trafficking.
 (b)  The Texas Higher Education Coordinating Board, in
 collaboration with the office of the attorney general, shall
 establish the content of the education and training required by
 this section.
 SECTION 2.  Subchapter A, Chapter 132, Education Code, is
 amended by adding Section 132.006 to read as follows:
 Sec. 132.006.  COMMERCIAL DRIVER'S LICENSE TRAINING
 PROGRAM; CERTAIN CURRICULUM REQUIREMENTS.  (a)  The commission by
 rule shall require each career school or college offering a
 commercial driver's license training program to include as a part
 of that program education and training on the recognition and
 prevention of human trafficking.
 (b)  The commission, in collaboration with the office of the
 attorney general, shall establish the content of the education and
 training required by this section.
 SECTION 3.  Section 522.022, Transportation Code, is amended
 to read as follows:
 Sec. 522.022.  LICENSE REQUIREMENTS. The department may not
 issue a commercial driver's license other than a non-domiciled
 license to a person unless the person:
 (1)  has a domicile:
 (A)  in this state; or
 (B)  in another state and is a member of the United
 States armed forces, including a member of the National Guard or a
 reserve or auxiliary unit of any branch of the armed forces, whose
 temporary or permanent duty station is located in this state;
 (2)  has passed knowledge and skills tests for driving
 a commercial motor vehicle that:
 (A)  comply with minimal federal standards
 established by 49 C.F.R. Part 383, Subparts G and H; and
 (B)  include questions prescribed by the
 department under Section 522.035 regarding the recognition and
 prevention of human trafficking; and
 (3)  has satisfied the requirements imposed by the
 federal act, federal regulation, or state law.
 SECTION 4.  Subchapter C, Chapter 522, Transportation Code,
 is amended by adding Section 522.035 to read as follows:
 Sec. 522.035.  RECOGNITION AND PREVENTION OF HUMAN
 TRAFFICKING. (a)  The department by rule shall prescribe questions
 for the commercial driver's license knowledge and skills tests
 required by Section 522.022 regarding the recognition and
 prevention of human trafficking.  In adopting rules under this
 subsection, the department may consult with the Texas Higher
 Education Coordinating Board, the Texas Workforce Commission, and
 organizations that specialize in the recognition and prevention of
 human trafficking.
 (b)  The department shall provide informational materials
 regarding the recognition and prevention of human trafficking for
 distribution to commercial driver's license applicants. The
 department may coordinate with organizations that specialize in the
 recognition and prevention of human trafficking to provide
 informational materials as required by this subsection.
 SECTION 5.  (a)  Not later than December 1, 2017, the Texas
 Higher Education Coordinating Board shall adopt rules necessary to
 implement Section 130.0105, Education Code, as added by this Act.
 (b)  Not later than December 1, 2017, the Texas Workforce
 Commission shall adopt rules necessary to implement Section
 132.006, Education Code, as added by this Act.
 (c)  Not later than December 1, 2017, the Department of
 Public Safety shall adopt rules necessary to implement Section
 522.035, Transportation Code, as added by this Act.
 (d)  The changes in law made by this Act apply only to an
 application for an original commercial driver's license submitted
 on or after December 1, 2017. An application for an original
 commercial driver's license submitted before that date is governed
 by the law in effect when the application was submitted, and the
 former law is continued in effect for that purpose.
 SECTION 6.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2017.
 * * * * *