Texas 2017 85th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1291 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Creighton S.B. No. 1291
 (In the Senate - Filed March 3, 2017; March 13, 2017, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Transportation;
 April 20, 2017, reported favorably by the following vote:  Yeas 9,
 Nays 0; April 20, 2017, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to permits for oversize and overweight vehicles in a
 certain county.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 623.252(b), Transportation Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 (b)  A permit issued under this subchapter may authorize:
 (1)  the transport of cargo only on the following roads
 in Chambers County:
 (A)  Farm-to-Market Road 1405 between its
 intersection with Farm-to-Market Road 2354 and its intersection
 with Farm-to-Market Road 565;
 (B)  [the frontage road of] State Highway 99,
 including the frontage road of State Highway 99 and the portion of
 the frontage road located in the Cedar Crossing Business and
 Industrial Park, other than a tolled segment of State Highway 99,
 between the [its] crossing of State Highway 99 with Cedar Bayou and
 its intersection with Interstate Highway 10[, including the portion
 of the frontage road located in the Cedar Crossing Business and
 Industrial Park];
 (C)  Farm-to-Market Road 565 from its
 intersection with Farm-to-Market Road 1405 to its intersection with
 State Highway 99; and
 (D)  Farm-to-Market Road 2354 from its
 intersection with Farm-to-Market Road 1405 northwest approximately
 300 linear feet to the termination of the state-maintained portion
 of the road; and
 (2)  the movement of equipment and commodities weighing
 100,000 pounds or less.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2017.
 * * * * *