Texas 2017 85th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1298 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 04/18/2017

                    By: Huffman, Nichols S.B. No. 1298
 (In the Senate - Filed March 3, 2017; March 13, 2017, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Criminal Justice;
 April 18, 2017, reported favorably by the following vote:  Yeas 7,
 Nays 0; April 18, 2017, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the selection and summons of prospective grand jurors.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Article 19.01, Code of Criminal Procedure, is
 amended to read as follows:
 Art. 19.01.  SELECTION AND SUMMONS OF PROSPECTIVE GRAND
 JURORS.  The district judge shall direct that 20 to 250 [125]
 prospective grand jurors be selected and summoned, with return on
 summons, in the same manner as for the selection and summons of
 panels for the trial of civil cases in the district courts.  The
 judge shall try the qualifications for and excuses from service as a
 grand juror and impanel the completed grand jury as provided by this
 chapter.
 SECTION 2.  A district judge who on or after the effective
 date of this Act directs that prospective grand jurors be selected
 and summoned shall comply with the requirements of Article 19.01,
 Code of Criminal Procedure, as amended by this Act.  A district
 judge who before the effective date of this Act directs that
 prospective grand jurors be selected and summoned shall comply with
 Article 19.01, Code of Criminal Procedure, as it existed
 immediately before the effective date of this Act.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2017.
 * * * * *