Texas 2017 85th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1298 Enrolled / Bill

Filed 05/27/2017

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    S.B. No. 1298


 AN ACT
 relating to the selection and summons of prospective grand jurors.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Article 19.01, Code of Criminal Procedure, is
 amended to read as follows:
 Art. 19.01.  SELECTION AND SUMMONS OF PROSPECTIVE GRAND
 JURORS. The district judge shall direct that the number of [20 to
 125] prospective grand jurors the judge considers necessary to
 ensure an adequate number of jurors under Article 19.26 be selected
 and summoned, with return on summons, in the same manner as for the
 selection and summons of panels for the trial of civil cases in the
 district courts. The judge shall try the qualifications for and
 excuses from service as a grand juror and impanel the completed
 grand jury as provided by this chapter.
 SECTION 2.  Article 19.08, Code of Criminal Procedure, is
 amended to read as follows:
 Art. 19.08.  QUALIFICATIONS. A [No] person may [shall] be
 selected or serve as a grand juror only if the person [who does not
 possess the following qualifications]:
 (1)  is at least 18 years of age;
 (2)  is [1.  The person must be] a citizen of the United
 States;
 (3)  is a resident of this state, and of the county in
 which the person is to serve;
 (4)  is[, and be] qualified under the Constitution and
 laws to vote in the [said] county in which the grand jury is
 sitting, regardless of whether the person is registered [provided
 that the person's failure to register] to vote [shall not be held to
 disqualify the person in this instance];
 (5)  is [2.  The person must be] of sound mind and good
 moral character;
 (6)  is [3.  The person must be] able to read and write;
 (7)  has not [4.  The person must not have] been
 convicted of misdemeanor theft or a felony;
 (8)  is not [5.  The person must not be] under
 indictment or other legal accusation for misdemeanor theft or a
 felony;
 (9)  is [6.  The person must] not [be] related within
 the third degree of consanguinity or second degree of affinity, as
 determined under Chapter 573, Government Code, to any person
 selected to serve or serving on the same grand jury;
 (10)  has [7.  The person must] not [have] served as
 grand juror in the year before the date on which the term of court
 for which the person has been selected as grand juror begins; and
 (11)  is [8.  The person must] not [be] a complainant
 in any matter to be heard by the grand jury during the term of court
 for which the person has been selected as a grand juror.
 SECTION 3.  The changes in law made by this Act apply to a
 grand jury impaneled on or after the effective date of this Act. A
 grand jury impaneled before the effective date of this Act is
 governed by the law in effect on the date the grand jury was
 impaneled, and the former law is continued in effect for that
 purpose.
 SECTION 4.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2017.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 1298 passed the Senate on
 April 26, 2017, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0; and that
 the Senate concurred in House amendment on May 27, 2017, by the
 following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 1298 passed the House, with
 amendment, on May 24, 2017, by the following vote: Yeas 146,
 Nays 0, two present not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 Approved:
 ______________________________
 Date
 ______________________________
 Governor