Texas 2017 85th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1330 Enrolled / Bill

Filed 05/27/2017

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    S.B. No. 1330


 AN ACT
 relating to funding for the operations of the Texas Low-Level
 Radioactive Waste Disposal Compact Commission.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 401.249(f), Health and Safety Code, is
 reenacted and amended to read as follows:
 (f)  The commission shall deposit in the fund [account] the
 portion of the fee collected under Section 401.245 that is
 calculated in accordance with Section 401.246(a) to support the
 activities of the Texas Low-Level Radioactive Waste Disposal
 Compact Commission, as required by Section 4.04(4), Texas Low-Level
 Radioactive Waste Disposal Compact (Section 403.006 of this code).
 The fee shall be assessed for party state compact waste and nonparty
 compact waste.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2017.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 1330 passed the Senate on
 May 2, 2017, by the following vote: Yeas 30, Nays 1; and that the
 Senate concurred in House amendment on May 27, 2017, by the
 following vote: Yeas 30, Nays 1.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 1330 passed the House, with
 amendment, on May 21, 2017, by the following vote: Yeas 139,
 Nays 2, one present not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 Approved:
 ______________________________
 Date
 ______________________________
 Governor