Texas 2017 85th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1343 Enrolled / Bill

Filed 05/29/2017

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    S.B. No. 1343


 AN ACT
 relating to the capture, use, or recording of certain items for
 commercial purposes, including the prosecution of criminal
 offenses regarding unauthorized recordings.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 503.001, Business & Commerce Code, is
 amended by adding Subsection (e) to read as follows:
 (e)  This section does not apply to voiceprint data retained
 by a financial institution or an affiliate of a financial
 institution, as those terms are defined by 15 U.S.C. Section 6809.
 SECTION 2.  Section 641.001(4), Business & Commerce Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 (4)  "Recording" means a tangible medium on which
 sounds, images, or both are recorded or otherwise stored,
 including:
 (A)  an original phonograph record, disc, tape,
 audio or video cassette, wire, film, memory card, flash drive, hard
 drive, data storage device, or other medium now existing or later
 developed; or
 (B)  a copy or reproduction that wholly or partly
 duplicates the original.
 SECTION 3.  Section 641.054, Business & Commerce Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 Sec. 641.054.  IMPROPER LABELING. (a)  A person commits an
 offense if:
 (1)  for commercial advantage or private financial
 gain, the person knowingly:
 (A)  advertises, offers for sale, sells, rents, or
 transports a recording;
 (B)  causes the sale, resale, rental, or
 transportation of a recording; or
 (C)  possesses a recording for a purpose described
 by Paragraph (A) or (B); and
 (2)  the outside cover, box, or jacket of the recording
 does not clearly and conspicuously disclose[:
 [(A)]  the actual name and address of the
 manufacturer[; and
 [(B)  the name of the performer or group].
 (b)  An offense under this section is punishable by:
 (1)  imprisonment for a term of not more than five
 years, a fine not to exceed $250,000, or both imprisonment and the
 fine, if:
 (A)  the offense involves [at least] 65 or more
 improperly labeled [unauthorized] recordings, or the commercial
 equivalent thereof, during a 180-day period; or
 (B)  the defendant has been previously convicted
 under this section;
 (2)  imprisonment for a term of not more than two years,
 a fine not to exceed $250,000, or both imprisonment and the fine, if
 the offense involves more than seven but fewer than 65 improperly
 labeled [unauthorized] recordings, or the commercial equivalent
 thereof, during a 180-day period; or
 (3)  confinement in the county jail for a term of not
 more than one year, a fine not to exceed $25,000, or both
 confinement and the fine, if the offense is not otherwise
 punishable under Subdivision (1) or (2).
 SECTION 4.  Article 42.037, Code of Criminal Procedure, is
 amended by adding Subsections (t), (u), and (v) to read as follows:
 (t)  If a person is convicted of an offense under Section
 641.054, Business & Commerce Code, the court shall order the person
 to make restitution to an owner or lawful producer of a master
 recording that has suffered financial loss as a result of the
 offense or to a trade association that represents that owner or
 lawful producer.  The amount of restitution ordered shall be:
 (1)  the greater of:
 (A)  the aggregate wholesale value of the lawfully
 manufactured and authorized recordings corresponding to the number
 of nonconforming recordings involved in the offense; or
 (B)  the actual financial loss to the owner,
 lawful producer, or trade association; and
 (2)  the costs associated with investigating the
 offense.
 (u)  For purposes of Subsection (t)(1)(A):
 (1)  the calculation of the aggregate wholesale value
 is based on the average wholesale value of the lawfully
 manufactured and authorized recordings; and
 (2)  the specific wholesale value of each nonconforming
 recording is not relevant to the calculation.
 (v)  For purposes of Subsection (t)(1)(B), the possession of
 a nonconforming recording intended for sale constitutes an actual
 financial loss to an owner or lawful producer equal to the actual
 value of the legitimate wholesale purchases displaced by the
 nonconforming recordings.
 SECTION 5.  (a)  Except as provided by Subsection (b) of
 this section, the changes in law made by this Act apply only to an
 offense committed on or after the effective date of this Act. An
 offense committed before the effective date of this Act is governed
 by the law in effect on the date the offense was committed, and the
 former law is continued in effect for that purpose. For purposes of
 this subsection, an offense was committed before the effective date
 of this Act if any element of the offense occurred before that date.
 (b)  The change in law made by this Act to Section 503.001,
 Business & Commerce Code, applies only to a violation that occurs on
 or after the effective date of this Act. A violation that occurs
 before the effective date of this Act is governed by the law in
 effect on the date the violation occurred, and the former law is
 continued in effect for that purpose.
 SECTION 6.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2017.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 1343 passed the Senate on
 April 20, 2017, by the following vote: Yeas 30, Nays 1; and that
 the Senate concurred in House amendment on May 28, 2017, by the
 following vote: Yeas 30, Nays 1.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 1343 passed the House, with
 amendment, on May 18, 2017, by the following vote: Yeas 143,
 Nays 3, two present not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 Approved:
 ______________________________
 Date
 ______________________________
 Governor