Texas 2017 85th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1353 Enrolled / Bill

Filed 05/26/2017

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    S.B. No. 1353


 AN ACT
 relating to state funding for school districts, including a school
 district to which an academically unacceptable school district is
 annexed.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 13.054, Education Code, is amended by
 amending Subsections (f) and (g) and adding Subsections (h), (i),
 and (j) to read as follows:
 (f)  For five years beginning with the school year in which
 the annexation occurs, a school district shall receive additional
 funding under this subsection or Subsection (h).  The amount of
 funding shall be determined [the commissioner shall annually adjust
 the local fund assignment of a district to which territory is
 annexed under this section] by multiplying the lesser of the
 enlarged district's local fund assignment computed under Section
 42.252 or the enlarged district's total cost of tier one by a
 fraction, the numerator of which is the number of students residing
 in the [district] territory annexed to the receiving district
 preceding the date of the annexation and the denominator of which is
 the number of students residing in the district as enlarged on the
 date of the annexation.
 (g)  In order to assist with the costs of facility
 renovation, repair, and replacement, a [A] district to which
 territory is annexed under this section is entitled to additional
 state aid for five years, beginning with the school year in which
 the annexation occurs [equal to the amount by which the annual debt
 service required to meet the indebtedness incurred by the district
 due to the annexation exceeds the additional amount of state aid
 that results from the adjustment under Subsection (f), if any]. The
 commissioner shall determine the amount of additional state aid
 provided each year by dividing the amount of debt service taxes
 received by the district during the tax year preceding the tax year
 in which the annexation occurs by the number of students enrolled in
 the district immediately preceding the date of annexation, and
 multiplying that result by the number of additional students
 enrolled in the district on September 1 after the date of
 annexation. The commissioner shall provide additional state aid
 under this subsection from funds appropriated for purposes of the
 Foundation School Program and available for that purpose. A
 determination by the commissioner under this subsection is final
 and may not be appealed.  [In determining the amount of annual debt
 service required, the estimated tax levy from applying the
 receiving district's current debt service tax rate, if any, to the
 territory that has been annexed shall be deducted.]
 (h)  The commissioner may authorize a district to receive
 payments provided by Subchapter G, instead of Subsection (f), if
 the commissioner determines that would result in greater payments
 for the district.  A determination by the commissioner is final and
 may not be appealed.
 (i)  The funding provided under Subsection (f), (g), or (h)
 is in addition to other funding the district receives through other
 provisions of this code, including Chapters 41 and 42.
 (j)  The commissioner may adopt rules as necessary to
 implement this section.
 SECTION 2.  Section 41.002(g), Education Code, is amended to
 read as follows:
 (g)  The wealth per student that a district may have under
 Subsection (e) is adjusted as follows:
 AWPS = WPS X (((EWL/280,000 - 1) X DTR/1.17 [1.5]) + 1)
 where:
 "AWPS" is the district's wealth per student;
 "WPS" is the district's wealth per student determined under
 Subsection (e);
 "EWL" is the equalized wealth level; and
 "DTR" is the district's adopted maintenance and operations
 tax rate for the current school year.
 SECTION 3.  Section 13.054(f), Education Code, as amended by
 this Act, and Section 13.054(h), Education Code, as added by this
 Act, apply only to an annexation that occurs on or after September
 1, 2017.  An annexation that occurs before that date is governed by
 Section 13.054(f), Education Code, as that section existed at the
 time the annexation occurred.
 SECTION 4.  Section 13.054(g), Education Code, as amended by
 this Act, applies to a school district to which territory is annexed
 under that section on or after July 1, 2016.
 SECTION 5.  The commissioner of education is required to
 implement this Act only if the legislature appropriates money
 specifically for that purpose.  If the legislature does not
 appropriate money specifically for that purpose, the commissioner
 of education may, but is not required to, implement this Act using
 other appropriations available for the purpose.
 SECTION 6.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2017.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 1353 passed the Senate on
 May 15, 2017, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0; and that the
 Senate concurred in House amendments on May 25, 2017, by the
 following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 1353 passed the House, with
 amendments, on May 23, 2017, by the following vote: Yeas 146,
 Nays 0, one present not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 Approved:
 ______________________________
 Date
 ______________________________
 Governor