S.B. No. 1381 AN ACT relating to photo identification for certain debit or credit card transactions. BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: SECTION 1. Subtitle A, Title 11, Business & Commerce Code, is amended by adding Chapter 508 to read as follows: CHAPTER 508. REQUIRING VERIFICATION OF IDENTITY FOR CERTAIN CARD TRANSACTIONS Sec. 508.001. DEFINITIONS. In this chapter: (1) "Cardholder" means the person named on the face of a credit card or debit card to whom or for whose benefit the credit card or debit card is issued. (2) "Credit card" means a card or device issued under an agreement by which the issuer gives to a cardholder the right to obtain credit from the issuer or another person. (3) "Debit card" means a card, device, or other means of access to an individual's account at a financial institution that the individual may use to initiate electronic fund transfers. (4) "Merchant" means a person in the business of selling goods or services. (5) "Mobile wallet" means a device that uses an encrypted digital token to authenticate a cardholder's identity and account information. (6) "Photo identification" means a card or other document that: (A) is issued by a governmental entity to identify an individual; and (B) displays a photograph of the individual identified on the card or other document. Sec. 508.002. REQUIRING PHOTO IDENTIFICATION FOR CREDIT OR DEBIT CARD TRANSACTION. (a) A merchant, in a point of sale transaction, may require the individual using the credit card or debit card to provide photo identification verifying the individual's identity as the cardholder. (b) A merchant may choose to not accept the card for payment if the individual fails to provide photo identification verifying the individual's identity as the cardholder. (c) This section does not apply to transactions conducted with a mobile wallet. Sec. 508.003. EXPIRATION. This chapter expires September 1, 2023. SECTION 2. This Act takes effect January 1, 2018. ______________________________ ______________________________ President of the Senate Speaker of the House I hereby certify that S.B. No. 1381 passed the Senate on April 19, 2017, by the following vote: Yeas 30, Nays 1; and that the Senate concurred in House amendment on May 26, 2017, by the following vote: Yeas 30, Nays 1. ______________________________ Secretary of the Senate I hereby certify that S.B. No. 1381 passed the House, with amendment, on May 19, 2017, by the following vote: Yeas 144, Nays 0, two present not voting. ______________________________ Chief Clerk of the House Approved: ______________________________ Date ______________________________ Governor