Texas 2017 85th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1386 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Taylor of Collin, Estes S.B. No. 1386
 (In the Senate - Filed March 7, 2017; March 16, 2017, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Transportation;
 April 18, 2017, reported favorably by the following vote:  Yeas 7,
 Nays 0, 1 present not voting; April 18, 2017, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the use of habitual toll violator remedies by certain
 toll project entities.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 372.101, Transportation Code, is amended
 to read as follows:
 Sec. 372.101.  APPLICABILITY. Except as provided by Section
 372.115(b), this [This] subchapter does not apply to a county
 acting under Chapter 284.
 SECTION 2.  Section 372.115, Transportation Code, is amended
 to read as follows:
 Sec. 372.115.  USE OF REMEDIES OPTIONAL; EXCEPTION FOR
 CERTAIN COUNTY TOLL AUTHORITIES. (a)  A toll project entity's use
 of remedies under this subchapter is cumulative of other remedies
 and, except as provided by Subsection (b), is optional.  Nothing[,
 and nothing] in this subchapter prohibits a toll project entity
 from exercising any other enforcement remedies available under this
 chapter or other law.
 (b)  A county acting under Chapter 284 that participates in a
 regional tollway authority under Chapter 366 shall pursue the
 habitual violator remedies under this subchapter.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2017.
 * * * * *