Texas 2017 85th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1402 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Campbell S.B. No. 1402
 (In the Senate - Filed March 7, 2017; March 16, 2017, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Business & Commerce;
 April 10, 2017, reported favorably by the following vote:  Yeas 8,
 Nays 0; April 10, 2017, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the regulation of cemeteries and the administration of
 perpetual care trust funds.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 711.056(a), Health and Safety Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 (a)  If after a hearing conducted as provided by Chapter
 2001, Government Code, the trier of fact finds that a violation of
 this chapter or a rule of the Finance Commission of Texas
 establishes a pattern of wilful disregard for the requirements of
 this chapter or rules of the finance commission, the trier of fact
 may [shall] recommend to the commissioner that the maximum
 administrative penalty permitted under Section 711.055 be imposed
 on the person committing the violation or that the commissioner
 cancel or not renew:
 (1)  the person's registration under Subchapter C-1, if
 the person is registered under that subchapter; or
 (2)  the person's permit under Chapter 154, Finance
 Code, if the person holds such a permit.
 SECTION 2.  Section 712.0034, Health and Safety Code, is
 amended by amending Subsection (b) and adding Subsection (c) to
 read as follows:
 (b)  To qualify for a certificate of authority under this
 chapter, an applicant must demonstrate to the satisfaction of the
 commissioner that:
 (1)  the applicant's business ability, experience,
 character, financial condition, and general fitness warrant the
 public's confidence;
 (2)  the cemetery operations manager has at least two
 years of experience in cemetery management;
 (3)  the issuance of the certificate of authority is in
 the public interest;
 (4)  the applicant, a principal of the applicant, or a
 person who controls the applicant does not owe the department a
 delinquent fee, assessment, administrative penalty, or other
 amount imposed under this chapter or a rule adopted or order issued
 under this chapter; and
 (5)  the applicant corporation:
 (A)  is in good standing and statutory compliance
 with this state;
 (B)  is authorized to engage in the perpetual care
 cemetery business in this state; [and]
 (C)  does not owe any delinquent franchise or
 other taxes to this state; and
 (D)  wholly owns all land on which the perpetual
 care cemetery will be located.
 (c)  For purposes of Subsection (b)(5)(D), an applicant
 corporation is considered to wholly own land regardless of whether
 the land is subject to a mortgage, deed of trust, or other lien.
 SECTION 3.  Section 712.0037, Health and Safety Code, is
 amended by adding Subsections (a-1) and (a-2) to read as follows:
 (a-1)  Notwithstanding Subsection (a), a certificate holder
 holding a certificate of authority issued before September 1, 2017,
 that does not on that date satisfy the ownership requirement under
 Section 712.0034(b)(5)(D) is not required to satisfy that ownership
 requirement as a condition of renewal until September 1, 2022. The
 commissioner may extend the period of compliance for the ownership
 requirement if the certificate holder:
 (1)  files a written application for the extension in
 the form and manner required by the department; and
 (2)  shows good cause for the extension.
 (a-2)  This subsection and Subsection (a-1) expire September
 1, 2028.
 SECTION 4.  Section 712.021, Health and Safety Code, is
 amended by amending Subsections (a) and (g) and adding Subsection
 (h) to read as follows:
 (a)  Except as provided by Subsection (h), a [A] corporation
 that operates a perpetual care cemetery in this state shall have a
 fund established with a trust company or a bank with trust powers
 that is located in this state. The trust company or bank may not
 have more than one director who is also a director of the
 corporation.
 (g)  In this subsection, "master trust account" means an
 account containing the perpetual care trust funds of two or more
 certificate holders for the purpose of collective investment and
 administration.  The trustors of two or more perpetual care trust
 funds may establish a master [common] trust account [fund] in which
 deposits required by this chapter are made, provided that separate
 records of principal and income are maintained for each perpetual
 care cemetery for the benefit of which the master [common] trust
 account [fund] is established, and further provided that the income
 attributable to each perpetual care cemetery is used only for the
 perpetual care of that cemetery.
 (h)  A corporation may apply to the commissioner for
 temporary relief and placement of a perpetual care trust fund in a
 segregated interest bearing account at a Texas financial
 institution, as defined by Section 201.101, Finance Code, if the
 corporation:
 (1)  has been operating a perpetual care cemetery in
 this state for at least two years; and
 (2)  has a perpetual care trust fund with a balance of
 less than $100,000, the income of which is insufficient to pay
 trustee fees.
 SECTION 5.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2017.
 * * * * *