Texas 2017 85th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1404 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 04/24/2017

                    By: Hughes S.B. No. 1404
 (In the Senate - Filed March 7, 2017; March 16, 2017, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Education; April 24, 2017,
 reported adversely, with favorable Committee Substitute by the
 following vote:  Yeas 10, Nays 1; April 24, 2017, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 1404 By:  Hughes


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to requiring school districts and open-enrollment charter
 schools to report certain information regarding expanded learning
 opportunities.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 42.006, Education Code, is amended by
 adding Subsection (a-2) to read as follows:
 (a-2)  The commissioner by rule shall require each school
 district and open-enrollment charter school to report through the
 Public Education Information Management System information for
 each campus of the district or school regarding:
 (1)  the availability of expanded learning
 opportunities as described by Section 33.252; and
 (2)  the number of students participating in each of
 the categories of expanded learning opportunities listed under
 Section 33.252(b).
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2017.
 * * * * *