Texas 2017 85th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1404 Enrolled / Bill

Filed 05/29/2017

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    S.B. No. 1404


 AN ACT
 relating to requiring school districts and open-enrollment charter
 schools to report certain information regarding expanded learning
 opportunities.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 42.006, Education Code, is amended by
 adding Subsection (a-2) to read as follows:
 (a-2)  The commissioner by rule shall require each school
 district and open-enrollment charter school to report through the
 Public Education Information Management System information for
 each campus of the district or school regarding:
 (1)  the availability of expanded learning
 opportunities as described by Section 33.252; and
 (2)  the number of students participating in each of
 the categories of expanded learning opportunities listed under
 Section 33.252(b).
 SECTION 2.  (a)  The Sunset Advisory Commission, as part of
 the review of the Expanded Learning Opportunities Council under
 Chapter 325, Government Code, shall review the information
 submitted under Section 42.006(a-2), Education Code, as added by
 this Act, to determine the availability of expanded learning
 opportunities and the role of regional education service centers in
 providing those opportunities throughout the state.
 (b)  Notwithstanding any other provision of law, the Sunset
 Advisory Commission shall review regional education service
 centers during the period in which state agencies scheduled to be
 reviewed or abolished in 2023 are reviewed, and unless continued in
 existence as provided by Chapter 325, Government Code, the centers
 are abolished and the law governing the centers and the law
 administered by the centers expire September 1, 2023.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2017.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 1404 passed the Senate on
 May 3, 2017, by the following vote: Yeas 28, Nays 3; and that the
 Senate concurred in House amendment on May 28, 2017, by the
 following vote: Yeas 29, Nays 2.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 1404 passed the House, with
 amendment, on May 23, 2017, by the following vote: Yeas 126,
 Nays 17, two present not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 Approved:
 ______________________________
 Date
 ______________________________
 Governor