Texas 2017 85th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1430 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 04/06/2017

                    By: Perry S.B. No. 1430
 (In the Senate - Filed March 8, 2017; March 20, 2017, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Agriculture, Water & Rural
 Affairs; April 6, 2017, reported adversely, with favorable
 Committee Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 7, Nays 0;
 April 6, 2017, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 1430 By:  Kolkhorst


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to a requirement that the Texas Commission on
 Environmental Quality provide an expedited procedure for acting on
 certain applications for an amendment to a water right by certain
 applicants that use desalinated seawater.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 11.122, Water Code, is amended by adding
 Subsections (b-1) and (b-2) to read as follows:
 (b-1)  A holder of a water right that begins using
 desalinated seawater after acquiring the water right has a right to
 expedited consideration of an application for an amendment to the
 water right if the amendment:
 (1)  authorizes the applicant to divert water from a
 diversion point that is different from or in addition to the point
 or points from which the applicant was authorized to divert water
 before the requested amendment;
 (2)  authorizes the applicant to divert from the
 different or additional diversion point an amount of water that is
 equal to or less than the amount of desalinated seawater used by the
 applicant;
 (3)  authorizes the applicant to divert from all of the
 diversion points authorized by the water right an amount of water
 that is equal to or less than the amount of water the applicant was
 authorized to divert under the water right before the requested
 amendment;
 (4)  authorizes the applicant to divert water from all
 of the diversion points authorized by the water right at a combined
 rate that is equal to or less than the combined rate at which the
 applicant was authorized to divert water under the water right
 before the requested amendment; and
 (5)  does not authorize the water diverted from the
 different or additional diversion point to be transferred to
 another river basin.
 (b-2)  The executive director or the commission shall
 prioritize the technical review of an application that is subject
 to Subsection (b-1) over the technical review of applications that
 are not subject to that subsection.
 SECTION 2.  Section 2003.047, Government Code, is amended by
 amending Subsection (e-3) and adding Subsection (e-6) to read as
 follows:
 (e-3)  The deadline specified by Subsection (e-2) or (e-6),
 as applicable, may be extended:
 (1)  by agreement of the parties with the approval of
 the administrative law judge; or
 (2)  by the administrative law judge if the judge
 determines that failure to extend the deadline would unduly deprive
 a party of due process or another constitutional right.
 (e-6)  For a matter pertaining to an application described by
 Section 11.122(b-1), Water Code, the administrative law judge must
 complete the proceeding and provide a proposal for decision to the
 commission not later than the 270th day after the date the matter
 was referred to the office.
 SECTION 3.  The changes in law made by this Act apply only to
 an application for an amendment to a water right that is filed with
 the Texas Commission on Environmental Quality on or after the
 effective date of this Act. An application filed with the
 commission before the effective date of this Act is governed by the
 law as it existed immediately before the effective date of this Act,
 and that law is continued in effect for that purpose.
 SECTION 4.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2017.
 * * * * *