Texas 2017 85th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1449 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 04/24/2017

                    By: Taylor of Galveston S.B. No. 1449
 (In the Senate - Filed March 8, 2017; March 20, 2017, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Business & Commerce;
 April 24, 2017, reported adversely, with favorable Committee
 Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 9, Nays 0; April 24, 2017,
 sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 1449 By:  Taylor of Galveston


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to an insurer's compliance with National Association of
 Insurance Commissioners requirements.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 36.004, Insurance Code, is amended to
 read as follows:
 Sec. 36.004.  COMPLIANCE WITH NATIONAL ASSOCIATION OF
 INSURANCE COMMISSIONERS REQUIREMENTS; INTERIM RULES. (a)  Except
 as provided by Subsection (c) and Section 36.005 and
 notwithstanding any other law, the department may not require an
 insurer to comply with a rule, regulation, directive, or standard
 adopted by the National Association of Insurance Commissioners,
 including a rule, regulation, directive, or standard relating to
 policy reserves, unless application of that version of the rule,
 regulation, directive, or standard is expressly authorized by
 statute [and approved by the commissioner].
 (b)  For purposes of Subsection (a), a version of a rule,
 regulation, directive, or standard is expressly authorized by
 statute if:
 (1)  the statute explicitly authorizes that version; or
 (2)  that version is the latest version of the rule,
 regulation, directive, or standard on the date that the statute was
 enacted.
 (c)  The commissioner may adopt an interim rule to require
 compliance with a rule, regulation, directive, or standard adopted
 by the National Association of Insurance Commissioners if:
 (1)  the commissioner finds the rule is technical or
 nonsubstantive in nature or necessary to preserve the department's
 accreditation; and
 (2)  before the adoption of the rule, the commissioner
 provides the standing committees of the senate and house of
 representatives with primary jurisdiction over the department with
 written notice of the commissioner's intent to adopt the rule.
 (d)  Unless the legislature during the following regular
 legislative session enacts a law expressly approving or reflecting
 the substance of an interim rule adopted under Subsection (c), the
 rule is effective until the earlier of:
 (1)  the day after the date on which the session ends;
 or
 (2)  the effective date of a law that expressly
 disapproves of or supersedes the rule.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2017.
 * * * * *