Texas 2017 85th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1465 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 04/12/2017

                    By: Taylor of Galveston S.B. No. 1465
 (In the Senate - Filed March 8, 2017; March 20, 2017, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Natural Resources &
 Economic Development; April 12, 2017, reported favorably by the
 following vote:  Yeas 11, Nays 0; April 12, 2017, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the authority of certain ex officio members of the board
 of directors of a tax increment financing reinvestment zone to
 elect not to serve on the board.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Chapter 311, Tax Code, is amended by adding
 Section 311.0092 to read as follows:
 Sec. 311.0092.  NOTICE TO STATE SENATOR AND STATE
 REPRESENTATIVE; WAIVER OF SERVICE ON BOARD. (a)  Not later than
 January 31 of each odd-numbered year, the board of directors of a
 reinvestment zone shall send to each member of the state senate and
 state house of representatives who is an ex officio member of the
 zone's board of directors under Section 311.009(b) or 311.0091(c),
 as applicable, written notice by certified mail informing the state
 senator or state representative of the person's membership on the
 board.
 (b)  Notwithstanding Section 311.009(b) or 311.0091(c), as
 applicable, a state senator or state representative may elect not
 to serve on the board or designate another individual to serve in
 the member's place.  If the state senator or state representative
 elects not to serve on the board or designate another individual to
 serve in the member's place, the state senator or state
 representative shall notify the board in writing as soon as
 practicable after receipt of the notice under Subsection (a) by
 certified mail and may not be counted as a member of the board for
 voting or quorum purposes.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2017.
 * * * * *