Texas 2017 85th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1466 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 04/24/2017

                    By: Taylor of Galveston S.B. No. 1466
 (In the Senate - Filed March 8, 2017; March 20, 2017, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Business & Commerce;
 April 24, 2017, reported adversely, with favorable Committee
 Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 9, Nays 0; April 24, 2017,
 sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 1466 By:  Nichols


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to maximum liability limits for windstorm and hail
 insurance coverage provided through the Texas Windstorm Insurance
 Association.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 2210.501(a), Insurance Code, is amended
 to read as follows:
 (a)  The board of directors shall propose the maximum
 liability limits under a windstorm and hail insurance policy issued
 by the association under this chapter.  The maximum liability
 limits are considered [must be] approved by the commissioner unless
 the commissioner disapproves or modifies the liability limits by
 order issued not later than the 30th day after the date of receipt
 of a filing under Section 2210.503.
 SECTION 2.  Section 2210.504(a), Insurance Code, is amended
 to read as follows:
 (a)  Not later than the 30th [60th] day after the date the
 commissioner disapproves or modifies [of receipt of] a filing under
 Section 2210.503, and after notice and hearing, the commissioner by
 order shall approve, disapprove, or modify the proposed adjustment
 to the maximum liability limits.
 SECTION 3.  The changes in law made by this Act apply only to
 a proposed maximum liability limit for an insurance policy
 delivered, issued for delivery, or renewed on or after January 1,
 2018. A proposed maximum liability limit for an insurance policy
 delivered, issued for delivery, or renewed before January 1, 2018,
 is governed by the law as it existed immediately before the
 effective date of this Act, and that law is continued in effect for
 that purpose.
 SECTION 4.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2017.
 * * * * *