Texas 2017 85th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1476 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 05/11/2017

                    By: Seliger S.B. No. 1476
 (King of Hemphill)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to eligibility for support from the universal service
 fund.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 56.023, Utilities Code, is amended by
 amending Subsection (p) and adding Subsections (r) and (s) to read
 as follows:
 (p)  If an incumbent local exchange company or cooperative is
 ineligible for support under a plan established under Section
 56.021(1) for services in an exchange, a plan established under
 Section 56.021(1) may not provide support to any other
 telecommunications providers for services in that exchange, except
 that an eligible telecommunications provider that is receiving
 support under Section 56.021(1)(A) in that exchange shall continue
 to receive such support until the commission determines that the
 support should be eliminated under Subsection (r) [the later of
 December 31, 2017, or the second anniversary of the date the
 incumbent local exchange provider or cooperative ceases receiving
 support in that exchange].  Until the commission eliminates the
 support under Subsection (r), the [The] support received by the
 eligible telecommunications provider [during that period] shall be
 at the same monthly per line support level in effect for that
 exchange as of the date the incumbent local exchange provider or
 cooperative ceases receiving funding in that exchange.
 (r)  If the number of access lines served by competitive
 eligible telecommunications providers receiving support in an
 exchange described by Subsection (p) declines by at least 50
 percent from the number of lines that were served by those providers
 in that exchange on December 31, 2016, the commission shall review
 the per line support amount for that exchange at least once every
 three years to determine whether continuing the support is in the
 public interest. The commission by rule shall establish the
 criteria to determine whether the support should be eliminated.
 The first review under this subsection for an exchange must be
 completed not later than the end of the year following the year in
 which the number of access lines first declines by at least 50
 percent.
 (s)  The support for eligible telecommunications providers
 under Subsections (p) and (r) expires December 31, 2023.
 SECTION 2.  Section 56.023(q), Utilities Code, is repealed.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2017.