Texas 2017 85th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1484 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 05/03/2017

                    By: Taylor of Galveston S.B. No. 1484
 (In the Senate - Filed March 8, 2017; March 20, 2017, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Education; May 3, 2017,
 reported adversely, with favorable Committee Substitute by the
 following vote:  Yeas 11, Nays 0; May 3, 2017, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 1484 By:  Taylor of Galveston


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the creation of an instructional materials web portal
 by the commissioner of education.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Chapter 31, Education Code, is amended by adding
 Subchapter B-2 to read as follows:
 SUBCHAPTER B-2.  INSTRUCTIONAL MATERIALS WEB PORTAL
 Sec. 31.081.  INSTRUCTIONAL MATERIALS WEB PORTAL. (a)  The
 commissioner shall develop and maintain a web portal to assist
 school districts and open-enrollment charter schools in selecting
 instructional materials under Section 31.101.
 (b)  The web portal must include general information such as
 price, computer system requirements, and any other relevant
 specifications for each instructional material:
 (1)  on the instructional materials list, including the
 list adopted under Section 31.0231; or
 (2)  submitted by a publisher for inclusion in the web
 portal.
 (c)  The commissioner by rule shall establish the procedure
 by which a publisher may submit instructional materials for
 inclusion in the web portal.
 (d)  The commissioner shall use a competitive process to
 contract for the development of the web portal.
 (e)  The commissioner shall use money in the state
 instructional materials fund to pay any expenses associated with
 the web portal.
 Sec. 31.082.  QUALITY OF INSTRUCTIONAL MATERIALS SUBMITTED
 BY PUBLISHER. (a)  The commissioner shall contract with a private
 entity to conduct an independent analysis of each instructional
 material submitted by a publisher for inclusion in the web portal
 developed under Section 31.081.  The analysis must:
 (1)  evaluate the quality of the material; and
 (2)  determine the extent to which the material covers
 the essential knowledge and skills identified under Section 28.002
 for the subject and grade level for which the material is intended
 to be used, including an identification of:
 (A)  each of the essential knowledge and skills
 for the subject and grade level or levels covered by the material;
 and
 (B)  the percentage of the essential knowledge and
 skills for the subject and grade level or levels covered by the
 material.
 (b)  The commissioner shall include in the web portal
 developed under Section 31.081 the results of each analysis
 conducted under Subsection (a).
 Sec. 31.083.  INSTRUCTIONAL MATERIALS REPOSITORY. (a)  In
 this section, "open educational resource" means a teaching,
 learning, or research resource that is in the public domain or has
 been released under an intellectual property license that permits
 the free use and repurposing of the resource by any person.  The
 term may include full course curricula, course materials, modules,
 textbooks, streaming videos, tests, software, and any other tools,
 materials, or techniques used to support access to knowledge.
 (b)  The commissioner shall include in the web portal
 developed under Section 31.081 a repository of open educational
 resources and other electronic instructional materials that school
 districts and open-enrollment charter schools may access at no
 cost, including state-developed open-source instructional
 materials purchased under Subchapter B-1.
 (c)  A publisher may submit instructional materials for
 inclusion in the repository.
 Sec. 31.084.  RULES. The commissioner may adopt rules as
 necessary to implement this subchapter.
 SECTION 2.  Section 31.004(b), Education Code, is amended to
 read as follows:
 (b)  To determine whether each student has instructional
 materials that cover all elements of the essential knowledge and
 skills as required by Subsection (a), a school district or
 open-enrollment charter school may consider:
 (1)  instructional materials adopted by the State Board
 of Education;
 (2)  materials adopted or purchased by the commissioner
 under Section 31.0231 or Subchapter B-1;
 (3)  open-source instructional materials submitted by
 eligible institutions and adopted by the State Board of Education
 under Section 31.0241;
 (4)  open-source instructional materials made
 available by other public schools; [and]
 (5)  instructional materials developed or purchased by
 the school district or open-enrollment charter school; and
 (6)  open educational resources and other electronic
 instructional materials included in the repository under Section
 31.083.
 SECTION 3.  Section 31.021(c), Education Code, is amended to
 read as follows:
 (c)  Money in the state instructional materials fund shall be
 used to:
 (1)  fund the instructional materials allotment, as
 provided by Section 31.0211;
 (2)  purchase special instructional materials for the
 education of blind and visually impaired students in public
 schools;
 (3)  pay the expenses associated with the instructional
 materials adoption and review process under this chapter;
 (4)  pay the expenses associated with the purchase or
 licensing of open-source instructional material;
 (5)  pay the expenses associated with the purchase of
 instructional material, including intrastate freight and shipping
 and the insurance expenses associated with intrastate freight and
 shipping;
 (6)  [fund the technology lending grant program
 established under Section 32.201; and
 [(7)]  provide funding to the Texas School for the
 Blind and Visually Impaired, the Texas School for the Deaf, and the
 Texas Juvenile Justice Department; and
 (7)  pay the expenses associated with the instructional
 materials web portal developed under Section 31.081.
 SECTION 4.  Not later than September 1, 2018, the
 commissioner of education shall develop the web portal required
 under Subchapter B-2, Chapter 31, Education Code, as added by this
 Act.
 SECTION 5.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2017.
 * * * * *