Texas 2017 85th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1492 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 04/10/2017

                    By: Zaffirini S.B. No. 1492
 (In the Senate - Filed March 8, 2017; March 20, 2017, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Business & Commerce;
 April 10, 2017, reported favorably by the following vote:  Yeas 9,
 Nays 0; April 10, 2017, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to rules adopted by the commissioner of insurance to
 stabilize long-term care premium rates.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 1651.055(b), Insurance Code, is
 repealed.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2017.
 * * * * *