Texas 2017 85th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1499 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 04/18/2017

                    By: Zaffirini S.B. No. 1499
 (In the Senate - Filed March 8, 2017; March 20, 2017, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Business & Commerce;
 April 18, 2017, reported adversely, with favorable Committee
 Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 9, Nays 0; April 18, 2017,
 sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 1499 By:  Zaffirini


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the regulation of for-profit legal service contract
 companies.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 953.001(1), Occupations Code, is amended
 to read as follows:
 (1)  "Administrator" means the person responsible for
 the administration of a legal service contract. [The term includes
 a person responsible for any filing required by this chapter.]
 SECTION 2.  Section 953.156, Occupations Code, is amended to
 read as follows:
 Sec. 953.156.  FORM OF LEGAL SERVICE CONTRACT AND REQUIRED
 DISCLOSURES. [(a)     A legal service contract must be filed with the
 executive director before it is marketed, sold, offered for sale,
 administered, or issued in this state. Any subsequent endorsement
 or attachment to the contract must also be filed with the executive
 director before the endorsement or attachment is delivered to legal
 service contract holders.
 [(b)]  A legal service contract marketed, sold, offered for
 sale, administered, or issued in this state must:
 (1)  be written, printed, or typed in clear,
 understandable language that is easy to read;
 (2)  include the name and full address of the company;
 (3)  include the purchase price of the contract and the
 terms under which the contract is sold;
 (4)  include the terms and restrictions governing
 cancellation of the contract by the company or the legal service
 contract holder;
 (5)  identify:
 (A)  any administrator, if the administrator is
 not the company;
 (B)  the sales representative; and
 (C)  the name of the legal service contract
 holder;
 (6)  include the amount of any deductible or copayment;
 (7)  specify the legal services and other benefits to
 be provided under the contract, and any limitation, exception, or
 exclusion;
 (8)  specify the legal services, if any, for which the
 company will provide reimbursement and the amount of that
 reimbursement;
 (9)  specify any restriction governing the
 transferability of the contract or the assignment of benefits;
 (10)  include the duties of the legal service contract
 holder;
 (11)  [include the contact information for the
 department, including the department's toll-free number and
 electronic mail address, as well as a statement that the department
 regulates the company and the company's sales representatives;
 [(12)]  explain the method to be used in resolving the
 legal service contract holder's complaints and grievances;
 (12) [(13)]  explain how legal services may be obtained
 under the legal service contract;
 (13) [(14)]  include a provision stating that no change
 in the contract is valid until the change has been approved by an
 executive officer of the company and unless the approval is
 endorsed or attached to the contract;
 (14) [(15)]  include any eligibility and effective
 date requirements, including a definition of eligible dependents
 and the effective date of their coverage;
 (15) [(16)]  include the conditions under which
 coverage will terminate;
 (16) [(17)]  explain any subrogation arrangements;
 (17) [(18)]  contain a payment provision that provides
 for a grace period of at least 31 days; and
 (18) [(19)]  include conditions under which contract
 rates may be modified[; and
 [(20)     include any other items required by the
 executive director as determined by rule].
 SECTION 3.  Section 953.162, Occupations Code, is amended to
 read as follows:
 Sec. 953.162.  APPOINTMENT AND RESPONSIBILITIES OF
 ADMINISTRATOR. [(a)]  A company may appoint an administrator or
 designate a person to be responsible for:
 (1)  all or any part of the administration or sale of
 legal service contracts; and
 (2)  compliance with this chapter.
 [(b)     The executive director may adopt rules regarding the
 registration of an administrator with the department.]
 SECTION 4.  Chapter 953, Occupations Code, is amended by
 adding Subchapter F to read as follows:
 SUBCHAPTER F. ENFORCEMENT
 Sec. 953.251.  DECEPTIVE TRADE PRACTICE. A violation of
 this chapter is a deceptive trade practice actionable under
 Subchapter E, Chapter 17, Business & Commerce Code.
 SECTION 5.  The following provisions of the Occupations Code
 are repealed:
 (1)  Sections 953.001(4), (5), and (6);
 (2)  Sections 953.004, 953.005, and 953.155; and
 (3)  Subchapters B, C, and E, Chapter 953.
 SECTION 6.  (a)  On the effective date of this Act, a
 registration issued under former Subchapter B, Chapter 953,
 Occupations Code, expires.
 (b)  On the effective date of this Act, a pending proceeding
 under Chapter 953, Occupations Code, including a complaint
 investigation, disciplinary action, or administrative penalty
 proceeding, relating to a registration issued under former
 Subchapter B, Chapter 953, Occupations Code, or relating to another
 former provision of Chapter 953, Occupations Code, that is repealed
 by this Act, is dismissed.
 SECTION 7.  This Act takes effect only if a specific
 appropriation for the implementation of the Act is provided in a
 general appropriations act of the 85th Legislature.
 SECTION 8.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2019.
 * * * * *