Texas 2017 85th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1522 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 04/03/2017

                    By: Nichols S.B. No. 1522
 (In the Senate - Filed March 8, 2017; March 20, 2017, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Transportation;
 April 3, 2017, reported adversely, with favorable Committee
 Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 9, Nays 0; April 3, 2017,
 sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 1522 By:  Nichols


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the composition of the aviation advisory committee.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Sections 21.003(a) and (b), Transportation Code,
 are amended to read as follows:
 (a)  The aviation advisory committee consists of [six]
 members appointed by the commission to advise the commission and
 the department on aviation matters.  The commission by rule shall
 determine the number of members of the committee.
 (b)  A majority of the members of the committee [member] must
 have five years of successful experience as:
 (1)  an aircraft pilot;
 (2)  an aircraft facilities manager; or
 (3)  a fixed-base operator.
 SECTION 2.  Not later than September 1, 2018, the Texas
 Transportation Commission shall adopt the rules required by Section
 21.003(a), Transportation Code, as amended by this Act.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2017.
 * * * * *