Texas 2017 85th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1538 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 04/06/2017

                    By: Watson S.B. No. 1538
 (In the Senate - Filed March 8, 2017; March 21, 2017, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Agriculture, Water & Rural
 Affairs; April 6, 2017, reported favorably by the following vote:
 Yeas 7, Nays 0; April 6, 2017, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the permissible uses of the floodplain management
 account.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 16.3161(c), Water Code, is amended to
 read as follows:
 (c)  The board may use the account to fund the performance
 of:
 (1)  the board's functions under Section 16.316; or
 (2)  any other activities related to:
 (A)  the collection and analysis of flood-related
 information;
 (B)  flood planning, protection, mitigation, or
 adaptation; or
 (C)  the provision of flood-related information
 to the public through educational or outreach programs.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2017.
 * * * * *