Texas 2017 85th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1538 Enrolled / Bill

Filed 05/26/2017

                    S.B. No. 1538


 AN ACT
 relating to the permissible uses of the floodplain management
 account.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 16.3161(c), Water Code, is amended to
 read as follows:
 (c)  The board may use the account to fund the performance
 of:
 (1)  the board's functions under Section 16.316; or
 (2)  any other activities related to:
 (A)  the collection and analysis of flood-related
 information;
 (B)  flood planning, protection, mitigation, or
 adaptation;
 (C)  the provision of flood-related information
 to the public through educational or outreach programs; or
 (D)  evaluating the response to and mitigation of
 flood incidents affecting residential property, including
 multi-family units, located in floodplains.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2017.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 1538 passed the Senate on
 April 19, 2017, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0; and that
 the Senate concurred in House amendment on May 26, 2017, by the
 following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 1538 passed the House, with
 amendment, on May 21, 2017, by the following vote: Yeas 140,
 Nays 3, one present not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 Approved:
 ______________________________
 Date
 ______________________________
 Governor