Texas 2017 85th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1548 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 04/20/2017

                    By: Menéndez S.B. No. 1548
 (In the Senate - Filed March 8, 2017; March 21, 2017, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Criminal Justice;
 April 20, 2017, reported adversely, with favorable Committee
 Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 7, Nays 0; April 20, 2017,
 sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 1548 By:  Menéndez


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to post-discharge services offered by a juvenile board or
 juvenile probation department to a child after the child's
 probation period ends.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Chapter 142, Human Resources Code, is amended by
 adding Section 142.007 to read as follows:
 Sec. 142.007.  POST-DISCHARGE SERVICES. (a)  For purposes
 of this section, "post-discharge services" means community-based
 services offered after a child is discharged from probation to
 support the child's vocational, educational, behavioral, or other
 goals and to provide continuity for the child as the child
 transitions out of juvenile probation services. The term includes:
 (1)  behavioral health services;
 (2)  mental health services;
 (3)  substance abuse services;
 (4)  mentoring;
 (5)  job training; and
 (6)  educational services.
 (b)  Provided that existing resources are available, a
 juvenile board or juvenile probation department may provide
 post-discharge services to a child for not more than six months
 after the date the child is discharged from probation, regardless
 of the age of the child on that date.
 (c)  A juvenile board or juvenile probation department may
 not require a child to participate in post-discharge services.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2017.
 * * * * *