Texas 2017 85th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1565 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 04/18/2017

                    By: Kolkhorst S.B. No. 1565
 (In the Senate - Filed March 8, 2017; March 21, 2017, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Health & Human Services;
 April 18, 2017, reported adversely, with favorable Committee
 Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 9, Nays 0; April 18, 2017,
 sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 1565 By:  Kolkhorst


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the procedure for ordering medical or dental services
 for certain persons admitted to or committed to care at certain
 state facilities.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 551.041, Health and Safety Code, is
 amended by amending Subsection (c) and adding Subsection (e) to
 read as follows:
 (c)  If a department requests consent to perform medical or
 dental treatment or services from a person or the guardian of the
 person whose consent is considered necessary and a reply is not
 obtained immediately, or if there is no guardian or responsible
 relative of the person to whom a request can be made, the
 superintendent or director of a department facility shall order:
 (1)  medical treatment or services for the person on
 the advice and consent of three primary care providers, at least two
 of whom are physicians licensed by the Texas Medical Board[, at
 least one of whom is primarily engaged in the private practice of
 medicine]; or
 (2)  dental treatment or services for the person on the
 advice and consent of two dentists [a dentist] licensed by the State
 Board of Dental Examiners and of one physician [two physicians]
 licensed by the Texas Medical Board[, at least one of whom is
 primarily engaged in the private practice of medicine].
 (e)  For purposes of this section, "primary care provider"
 means a health care professional who provides health care services
 to a defined population of residents.  The term includes a physician
 licensed by the Texas Medical Board, an advanced practice
 registered nurse licensed by the Texas Board of Nursing, and a
 physician assistant licensed by the Texas Physician Assistant
 Board.
 SECTION 2.  The changes in law made by this Act apply only to
 a medical or dental procedure performed on or after the effective
 date of this Act.  A medical or dental procedure performed before
 the effective date of this Act is governed by the law as it existed
 immediately before the effective date of this Act, and that law is
 continued in effect for that purpose.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2017.
 * * * * *