Texas 2017 85th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1592 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 04/10/2017

                    By: Schwertner S.B. No. 1592
 (In the Senate - Filed March 9, 2017; March 21, 2017, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Health & Human Services;
 April 10, 2017, reported favorably by the following vote:  Yeas 8,
 Nays 0; April 10, 2017, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the amount of an administrative penalty assessed
 against freestanding emergency medical care facilities.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 254.205(c), Health and Safety Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 (c)  Each [The amount of the penalty may not exceed $1,000
 for each violation, and each] day a violation continues or occurs is
 a separate violation for purposes of imposing a penalty. The total
 amount of the penalty assessed for a violation continuing or
 occurring on separate days under this subsection may not exceed
 $25,000 [$5,000].
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2017.
 * * * * *