Texas 2017 85th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1633 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 04/24/2017

                    By: Perry S.B. No. 1633
 (In the Senate - Filed March 9, 2017; March 22, 2017, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Health & Human Services;
 April 24, 2017, reported adversely, with favorable Committee
 Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 8, Nays 0; April 24, 2017,
 sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 1633 By:  Perry


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the provision of pharmacy services through a
 telepharmacy system; establishing a remote dispensing site
 license.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 562.110, Occupations Code, is amended by
 amending Subsections (a), (b), (d), (e), and (f) and adding
 Subsections (g), (h), and (i) to read as follows:
 (a)  In this section:
 (1)  "Provider pharmacy" means a Class A pharmacy that
 provides pharmacy services through a telepharmacy system at a
 remote dispensing site.
 (2)  "Remote dispensing site" means a location licensed
 as a telepharmacy that is authorized by a provider pharmacy through
 a telepharmacy system to store and dispense prescription drugs and
 devices, including dangerous drugs and controlled substances.
 (3)  "Telepharmacy[, "telepharmacy] system" means a
 system that monitors the dispensing of prescription drugs and
 provides for related drug use review and patient counseling
 services by an electronic method, including the use of the
 following types of technology:
 (A) [(1)]  audio and video;
 (B) [(2)]  still image capture; and
 (C) [(3)]  store and forward.
 (b)  A Class A or Class C pharmacy located in this state may
 provide pharmacy services, including the dispensing of drugs,
 through a telepharmacy system at locations separate from [in a
 facility that is not at the same location as] the Class A or Class C
 pharmacy.
 (d)  A telepharmacy system may be located only at:
 (1)  a health care facility in this state that is
 regulated by this state or the United States; or
 (2)  a remote dispensing site.
 (e)  The board shall adopt rules regarding the use of a
 telepharmacy system under this section, including:
 (1)  the types of health care facilities at which a
 telepharmacy system may be located under Subsection (d)(1), which
 must include the following facilities:
 (A)  a clinic designated as a rural health clinic
 regulated under 42 U.S.C. Section 1395x(aa)[, as amended]; and
 (B)  a health center as defined by 42 U.S.C.
 Section 254b[, as amended];
 (2)  the locations eligible to be licensed as remote
 dispensing sites, which must include locations in medically
 underserved areas, areas with a medically underserved population,
 and health professional shortage areas determined by the United
 States Department of Health and Human Services;
 (3)  licensing and operating requirements for remote
 dispensing sites, including:
 (A)  a requirement that a remote dispensing site
 license identify the provider pharmacy that will provide pharmacy
 services at the remote dispensing site;
 (B)  a requirement that a provider pharmacy be
 allowed to provide pharmacy services at not more than two remote
 dispensing sites;
 (C)  a requirement that a pharmacist employed by a
 provider pharmacy make at least monthly on-site visits to a remote
 dispensing site or more frequent visits if specified by board rule;
 (D)  a requirement that each month the perpetual
 inventory of controlled substances at the remote dispensing site be
 reconciled to the on-hand count of those controlled substances at
 the site by a pharmacist employed by the provider pharmacy;
 (E)  a requirement that a pharmacist employed by a
 provider pharmacy be physically present at a remote dispensing site
 when the pharmacist is providing services requiring the physical
 presence of the pharmacist, including immunizations;
 (F)  a requirement that a remote dispensing site
 be staffed by an on-site pharmacy technician who is under the
 continuous supervision of a pharmacist employed by the provider
 pharmacy;
 (G)  a requirement that all pharmacy technicians
 at a remote dispensing site be counted for the purpose of
 establishing the pharmacist-pharmacy technician ratio of the
 provider pharmacy, which, notwithstanding Section 568.006, may not
 exceed three pharmacy technicians for each pharmacist providing
 supervision;
 (H)  a requirement that, before working at a
 remote dispensing site, a pharmacy technician must:
 (i)  have worked at least one year at a
 retail pharmacy during the three years preceding the date the
 pharmacy technician begins working at the remote dispensing site;
 and
 (ii)  have completed a board-approved
 training program on the proper use of a telepharmacy system; and
 (I)  any additional training or practice
 experience requirements for pharmacy technicians at a remote
 dispensing site;
 (4)  the areas that qualify under Subsection (f);
 (5) [(3)]  recordkeeping requirements; and
 (6) [(4)]  security requirements.
 (f)  A telepharmacy system located at a health care facility
 under Subsection (d)(1) may not be located in a community in which a
 Class A or Class C pharmacy is located as determined by board rule.
 If a Class A or Class C pharmacy is established in a community in
 which a telepharmacy system has been located under this section,
 the telepharmacy system may continue to operate in that community.
 (g)  A telepharmacy system located at a remote dispensing
 site under Subsection (d)(2) may not dispense a controlled
 substance listed in Schedule II as established by the commissioner
 of state health services under Chapter 481, Health and Safety Code,
 and may not be located within 25 miles by road of a Class A pharmacy.
 (h)  If a Class A pharmacy is established within 25 miles by
 road of a remote dispensing site that is currently operating, the
 remote dispensing site may continue to operate at that location.
 (i)  The board by rule shall require and develop a process
 for a remote dispensing site to apply for classification as a Class
 A pharmacy if the average number of prescriptions dispensed each
 day the remote dispensing site is open for business is more than
 125, as calculated each calendar year.
 SECTION 2.  The Texas State Board of Pharmacy shall adopt
 rules under Section 562.110, Occupations Code, as amended by this
 Act, not later than January 1, 2018.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2017.
 * * * * *