Texas 2017 85th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1634 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 04/05/2017

                    By: Taylor of Galveston S.B. No. 1634
 (In the Senate - Filed March 9, 2017; March 22, 2017, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Education; April 5, 2017,
 reported favorably by the following vote:  Yeas 11, Nays 0;
 April 5, 2017, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to a reduction in required days of service for educators in
 public schools under certain circumstances.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 21.401, Education Code, is amended by
 amending Subsection (b) and adding Subsection (c-1) to read as
 follows:
 (b)  Except as provided by Subsection (c-1), an [An] educator
 employed under a 10-month contract must provide a minimum of 187
 days of service.
 (c-1)  If a school district anticipates providing less than
 180 days of instruction for students during a school year, as
 indicated by the district's academic calendar, the district may
 reduce the number of days of service required by this section
 proportionately.  A reduction by the district does not reduce an
 educator's salary.
 SECTION 2.  Section 21.401, Education Code, as amended by
 this Act, applies only to a contract executed on or after the
 effective date of this Act. A contract executed before the
 effective date of this Act is governed by the law in effect on the
 date the contract was executed, and the former law is continued in
 effect for that purpose.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2017.
 * * * * *