Texas 2017 85th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1649 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 05/04/2017

                    By: Watson S.B. No. 1649
 (In the Senate - Filed March 9, 2017; March 22, 2017, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Criminal Justice;
 May 4, 2017, reported adversely, with favorable Committee
 Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 5, Nays 0; May 4, 2017,
 sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 1649 By:  Perry


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to increasing the punishment for certain conduct
 constituting the offense of criminal trespass.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 30.05(b), Penal Code, is amended by
 adding Subdivision (12) to read as follows:
 (12)  "Institution of higher education" has the meaning
 assigned by Section 61.003, Education Code.
 SECTION 2.  Section 30.05, Penal Code, is amended by
 amending Subsection (d) and adding Subsection (d-1) to read as
 follows:
 (d)  An offense under this section is:
 (1)  a Class B misdemeanor, except as provided by
 Subdivisions (2) and (3);
 (2)  a Class C misdemeanor, except as provided by
 Subdivision (3), if the offense is committed:
 (A)  on agricultural land and within 100 feet of
 the boundary of the land; or
 (B)  on residential land and within 100 feet of a
 protected freshwater area; and
 (3)  a Class A misdemeanor if:
 (A)  the offense is committed:
 (i)  in a habitation or a shelter center;
 (ii)  on a Superfund site; or
 (iii)  on or in a critical infrastructure
 facility; [or]
 (B)  the offense is committed on or in property of
 an institution of higher education and it is shown on the trial of
 the offense that the person has previously been convicted of:
 (i)  an offense under this section relating
 to entering or remaining on or in property of an institution of
 higher education; or
 (ii)  an offense under Section 51.204(b)(1),
 Education Code, relating to trespassing on the grounds of an
 institution of higher education; or
 (C)  the person carries a deadly weapon during the
 commission of the offense.
 (d-1)  For the purposes of Subsection (d)(3)(B), a person has
 previously been convicted of an offense described by that paragraph
 if the person was adjudged guilty of the offense or entered a plea
 of guilty or nolo contendere in return for a grant of deferred
 adjudication community supervision, regardless of whether the
 sentence for the offense was ever imposed or whether the sentence
 was probated and the person was subsequently discharged from
 deferred adjudication community supervision.
 SECTION 3.  The change in law made by this Act applies only
 to an offense committed on or after the effective date of this Act.
 An offense committed before the effective date of this Act is
 governed by the law in effect on the date the offense was committed,
 and the former law is continued in effect for that purpose.  For
 purposes of this section, an offense was committed before the
 effective date of this Act if any element of the offense occurred
 before that date.
 SECTION 4.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2017.
 * * * * *