Texas 2017 85th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1654 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 04/18/2017

                    By: Watson S.B. No. 1654
 (In the Senate - Filed March 9, 2017; March 22, 2017, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Transportation;
 April 18, 2017, reported favorably by the following vote:  Yeas 9,
 Nays 0; April 18, 2017, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the electronic transmission of a notice of toll
 nonpayment by the Texas Department of Transportation.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 228.0545, Transportation Code, is
 amended by adding Subsection (e) to read as follows:
 (e)  The department may provide that the notice under
 Subsection (c), instead of being sent by first class mail, be sent
 as an electronic record to a registered owner that agrees to the
 terms of the electronic record transmission of the information.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2017.
 * * * * *