Texas 2017 85th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1659 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 05/01/2017

                    By: Taylor of Galveston S.B. No. 1659
 (In the Senate - Filed March 9, 2017; March 22, 2017, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Education; May 1, 2017,
 reported adversely, with favorable Committee Substitute by the
 following vote:  Yeas 11, Nays 0; May 1, 2017, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 1659 By:  Taylor of Galveston


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the commissioner of education accepting contributions
 for the public school system, adopting rules regarding grant
 compliance, and establishing grants for high-quality educational
 programs.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 7.055(b), Education Code, is amended by
 adding Subdivision (42) to read as follows:
 (42)  The commissioner may accept a gift, grant,
 donation, or other contribution on behalf of the public school
 system or agency and, unless otherwise specified by the donor, may
 use the contribution in the manner the commissioner determines.
 SECTION 2.  Subchapter C, Chapter 7, Education Code, is
 amended by adding Section 7.067 to read as follows:
 Sec. 7.067.  GRANT COMPLIANCE. (a)  The commissioner may:
 (1)  adopt rules to ensure that recipients of
 state-funded grants administered by the commissioner or the agency
 are in compliance with grant requirements; and
 (2)  require a grant recipient to provide information
 to the agency detailing grant compliance.
 (b)  The commissioner may direct the agency to make a site
 visit to a grant recipient to review the recipient's compliance
 with grant requirements.  A review conducted under this subsection
 is not subject to Section 7.028 or 39.056.
 (c)  If the commissioner finds that a grant recipient is not
 in compliance with grant requirements, the commissioner may:
 (1)  seek the remittance of the grant funds; and
 (2)  withhold funding authorized under Section 12.106
 or Chapter 42 or any other state funding in an amount sufficient to
 recover the grant funds provided to the recipient.
 (d)  A decision of the commissioner regarding grant
 compliance, including a decision to withhold funding under
 Subsection (c), is final and may not be appealed.
 SECTION 3.  Subchapter Z, Chapter 29, Education Code, is
 amended by adding Section 29.924 to read as follows:
 Sec. 29.924.  HIGH-QUALITY EDUCATIONAL PROGRAM GRANTS.
 (a)  The commissioner shall establish a competitive grant program
 to assist school districts and open-enrollment charter schools in
 implementing high-quality educational programs.
 (b)  The commissioner may adopt rules on the use of grant
 funds under this section, including rules determining eligibility,
 award amount, and any restrictions. The commissioner may authorize
 a grant recipient or a tax-exempt organization contracting with the
 grant recipient to use grant funds for facility purposes and
 performance-based incentives.
 (c)  The commissioner may make grants under this section
 using funds from available sources, including gifts, grants, and
 donations accepted by the commissioner.  A decision of the
 commissioner concerning the amount of funds available for a grant
 is final and may not be appealed.
 SECTION 4.  The commissioner of education is required to
 implement this Act only if the legislature appropriates money
 specifically for that purpose.  If the legislature does not
 appropriate money specifically for that purpose, the commissioner
 of education may, but is not required to, implement this Act using
 other appropriations available for the purpose.
 SECTION 5.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2017.
 * * * * *