Texas 2017 85th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1683 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 05/04/2017

                    By: Lucio S.B. No. 1683
 (In the Senate - Filed March 9, 2017; March 22, 2017, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Health & Human Services;
 May 4, 2017, reported favorably by the following vote:  Yeas 5,
 Nays 4; May 4, 2017, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to food allergen awareness in food service establishments.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Chapter 437, Health and Safety Code, is amended
 by adding Section 437.024 to read as follows:
 Sec. 437.024.  FOOD ALLERGEN AWARENESS. (a)  A food service
 establishment shall display a poster relating to food allergen
 awareness in an area of the establishment accessible primarily to
 employees of the establishment.  The department shall determine the
 form and content of the poster and post a sample poster on the
 department's Internet website.
 (b)  A food service establishment may display the
 information from the sample poster in lieu of the poster, provided
 that the information is presented and posted in a manner that is
 easily readable by the establishment's employees in the selected
 employee area.
 (c)  The poster or posted information must include
 information regarding:
 (1)  the risk of an allergic reaction;
 (2)  the eight major food allergens, including milk,
 wheat, eggs, soy, shellfish, peanuts, tree nuts, and fish; and
 (3)  methods for preventing cross-contamination in
 food preparation.
 (d)  The executive commissioner shall adopt rules necessary
 to implement this section.
 (e)  This section does not create a private cause of action
 or change any common law or statutory duty.
 SECTION 2.  Not later than December 1, 2017:
 (1)  the Department of State Health Services shall
 determine the form and content of the poster and post the sample
 poster on the department's Internet website as required by Section
 437.024, Health and Safety Code, as added by this Act; and
 (2)  the executive commissioner of the Health and Human
 Services Commission shall adopt any rules necessary to implement
 Section 437.024, Health and Safety Code, as added by this Act.
 SECTION 3.  Notwithstanding Section 437.024, Health and
 Safety Code, as added by this Act, a food service establishment is
 not required to comply with that section before January 1, 2018.
 SECTION 4.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2017.
 * * * * *