Texas 2017 85th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1696 Introduced / Bill

Filed 03/09/2017

                    85R14637 CAE-D
 By: Lucio S.B. No. 1696


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to a study on participation of public schools in a
 universal lunch program offered through the United States
 Department of Agriculture.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter Z, Chapter 33, Education Code, is
 amended by adding Section 33.9011 to read as follows:
 Sec. 33.9011.  STUDY ON PROVIDING UNIVERSAL LUNCH. (a) Not
 later than October 1, 2017, the agency, with assistance from the
 Department of Agriculture, shall conduct a study to determine the
 school districts and open-enrollment charter schools eligible to
 provide a universal lunch to all students through participation in
 the Community Eligibility Provision administered by the United
 States Department of Agriculture, as provided by the Healthy,
 Hunger-Free Kids Act of 2010 (Pub. L. No. 111-296).
 (b)  Not later than December 1, 2017, the agency shall:
 (1)  notify each school district and open-enrollment
 charter school that is eligible to participate in the Community
 Eligibility Provision; and
 (2)  require each district and school notified under
 Subdivision (1) to:
 (A)  perform an economic analysis of cost savings
 that would result from participation in the program; and
 (B)  report the results of the analysis to the
 agency not later than December 15, 2017.
 (c)  Not later than January 31, 2018, the agency shall submit
 a report to the governor, lieutenant governor, speaker of the house
 of representatives, and members of the legislature on the number of
 school districts and open-enrollment charter schools eligible to
 provide a universal lunch to all students through participation in
 the Community Eligibility Provision and the potential cost savings
 that could result from that participation.
 (d)  This section expires September 1, 2018.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2017.