Texas 2017 85th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1731 Introduced / Bill

Filed 03/09/2017

                    85R8334 AAF-D
 By: Birdwell S.B. No. 1731


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the repeal of laws governing certain state entities and
 a state compact, including the functions of those entities.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  AGRICULTURE AND WILDLIFE RESEARCH AND MANAGEMENT
 ADVISORY COMMITTEE. (a) The Agriculture and Wildlife Research and
 Management Advisory Committee is abolished.
 (b)  Section 50.001, Agriculture Code, is amended to read as
 follows:
 Sec. 50.001.  PROGRAM. The Texas Agricultural Experiment
 Station[, in consultation with the Agriculture and Wildlife
 Research and Management Advisory Committee established under
 Section 88.216, Education Code,] shall develop and administer a
 program to finance agriculture and wildlife research that the Texas
 Agricultural Experiment Station determines to be of the highest
 scientific merit and to offer significant promise in providing new
 directions for long-term solutions to continued agriculture
 production, water availability, and wildlife habitat availability.
 (c)  Section 88.216, Education Code, is repealed.
 SECTION 2.  STATE OF TEXAS ANNIVERSARY REMEMBRANCE DAY MEDAL
 COMMITTEE. (a) The State of Texas Anniversary Remembrance Day
 Medal Committee is abolished.
 (b)  Chapter 3103, Government Code, is repealed.
 SECTION 3.  TEXAS BIOENERGY POLICY COUNCIL AND TEXAS
 BIOENERGY RESEARCH COMMITTEE. (a) The Texas Bioenergy Policy
 Council and the Texas Bioenergy Research Committee are abolished.
 (b)  Chapter 50D, Agriculture Code, is repealed.
 (c)  To the extent of any conflict, this section prevails
 over another Act of the 85th Legislature, Regular Session, 2017,
 relating to nonsubstantive additions to and corrections in enacted
 codes.
 SECTION 4.  BORDER SECURITY COUNCIL. (a) The Border
 Security Council is abolished.
 (b)  Section 421.0025, Government Code, is repealed.
 SECTION 5.  COLLEGE OPPORTUNITY ACT COMMITTEE. (a) The
 College Opportunity Act committee is abolished.
 (b)  Chapter 1233, Government Code, is repealed.
 SECTION 6.  TEXAS DISTINGUISHED SERVICE AWARDS COMMITTEE.
 (a) The Texas Distinguished Service Awards Committee is abolished.
 (b)  Chapter 3102, Government Code, is repealed.
 SECTION 7.  ADVISORY BOARD OF ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT
 STAKEHOLDERS. (a) The advisory board of economic development
 stakeholders is abolished.
 (b)  Section 481.169, Government Code, is repealed.
 SECTION 8.  TEXAS EMISSIONS REDUCTION PLAN ADVISORY BOARD.
 (a) The Texas Emissions Reduction Plan Advisory Board is
 abolished.
 (b)  Sections 386.057(a) and (b), Health and Safety Code, are
 amended to read as follows:
 (a)  The commission[, in consultation with the advisory
 board,] annually shall review programs established under the plan,
 including each project funded under the plan, the amount granted
 for the project, the emissions reductions attributable to the
 project, and the cost-effectiveness of the project.
 (b)  Not later than December 1, 2002, and not later than
 December 1 of each subsequent second year, the commission[, in
 consultation with the advisory board,] shall publish and submit to
 the legislature a biennial plan report. The report must include:
 (1)  the information included in the annual reviews
 conducted under Subsection (a);
 (2)  specific information for individual projects as
 required by Subsection (c);
 (3)  information contained in reports received under
 Sections 386.205, 388.003(e), 388.006, and 391.104; and
 (4)  a summary of the commission's activities under
 Section 386.052.
 (c)  Section 386.104(f), Health and Safety Code, is amended
 to read as follows:
 (f)  A proposed retrofit, repower, replacement, or add-on
 equipment project must document, in a manner acceptable to the
 commission, a reduction in emissions of oxides of nitrogen of at
 least 30 percent compared with the baseline emissions adopted by
 the commission for the relevant engine year and application. After
 study of available emissions reduction technologies and[,] after
 public notice and comment, [and after consultation with the
 advisory board,] the commission may revise the minimum percentage
 reduction in emissions of oxides of nitrogen required by this
 subsection to improve the ability of the program to achieve its
 goals.
 (d)  Sections 386.107, 386.114, and 386.115, Health and
 Safety Code, are amended to read as follows:
 Sec. 386.107.  ADJUSTMENT TO MAXIMUM COST-EFFECTIVENESS
 AMOUNT AND AWARD AMOUNT. After study of available emissions
 reduction technologies and costs and after public notice and
 comment, the commission[, in consultation with the advisory board,]
 may change the values of the maximum grant award criteria
 established in Section 386.106 to account for inflation or to
 improve the ability of the program to achieve its goals.
 Sec. 386.114.  MODIFICATION OF INCENTIVE EMISSIONS
 STANDARDS. After evaluating new technologies and after public
 notice and comment, the commission[, in consultation with the
 advisory board,] may change the incentive emissions standards
 established by Section 386.113 to improve the ability of the
 program to achieve its goals.
 Sec. 386.115.  MODIFICATION OF VEHICLE ELIGIBILITY. After
 evaluating the availability of vehicles meeting the emissions
 standards and after public notice and comment, the commission[, in
 consultation with the advisory board,] may expand the program to
 include other on-road vehicles, regardless of fuel type used, that
 meet the emissions standards, have a gross vehicle weight rating of
 greater than 8,500 pounds, and are purchased or leased in lieu of a
 new on-road diesel.
 (e)  Section 386.252(d), Health and Safety Code, is amended
 to read as follows:
 (d)  The commission may reallocate money designated for the
 Texas natural gas vehicle grant program under Chapter 394 to other
 programs described under Subsection (a) if:
 (1)  the commission, in consultation with the governor
 [and the advisory board], determines that the use of the money in
 the fund for that program will cause the state to be in
 noncompliance with the state implementation plan to the extent that
 federal action is likely; and
 (2)  the commission finds that the reallocation of some
 or all of the funding for the program would resolve the
 noncompliance.
 (f)  Sections 394.005(a) and (g), Health and Safety Code, are
 amended to read as follows:
 (a)  The commission by rule shall establish criteria for
 prioritizing qualifying vehicles eligible to receive grants under
 this chapter. The commission shall review and revise the criteria
 as appropriate [after consultation with the advisory board].
 (g)  The commission shall establish baseline emission levels
 for emissions of nitrogen oxides for on-road heavy-duty or
 medium-duty motor vehicles being replaced by using the emission
 certification for the engine or vehicle being replaced. The
 commission may consider deterioration of the emission performance
 of the engine of the vehicle being replaced in establishing the
 baseline emission level. The commission may consider and establish
 baseline emission rates for additional pollutants of concern, as
 determined by the commission [after consultation with the advisory
 board].
 (g)  The following provisions of the Health and Safety Code
 are repealed:
 (1)  Section 386.001(1);
 (2)  Section 386.058; and
 (3)  Section 394.001(1).
 SECTION 9.  FIRE ANT RESEARCH AND MANAGEMENT ACCOUNT
 ADVISORY COMMITTEE. (a) The Fire Ant Research and Management
 Account Advisory Committee is abolished.
 (b)  The following provisions are repealed:
 (1)  Section 77.022, Agriculture Code; and
 (2)  Section 88.215, Education Code.
 SECTION 10.  OFFICE OF PATIENT PROTECTION. (a) The office
 of patient protection is abolished.
 (b)  Subchapter G, Chapter 101, Occupations Code, is
 repealed.
 (c)  The Health Professions Council may use the amount of any
 fee increase collected under former Section 101.307, Occupations
 Code, for the purposes for which an assessment under Section
 101.006, Occupations Code, may be used.
 SECTION 11.  SOUTHERN REGIONAL EDUCATION COMPACT. (a) The
 State of Texas withdraws from the regional education compact under
 Section 160.02, Education Code.  The secretary of state shall
 provide written notice of the withdrawal and a certified copy of
 this Act to the Board of Control for Southern Regional Education as
 provided by that section not later than October 1, 2017.
 (b)  Effective October 1, 2019:
 (1)  Section 54.233, Education Code, is repealed; and
 (2)  Chapter 160, Education Code, is repealed.
 SECTION 12.  Except as otherwise provided by this Act, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2017.