Texas 2017 85th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1745 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 05/02/2017

                    By: Hinojosa S.B. No. 1745
 (In the Senate - Filed March 9, 2017; March 23, 2017, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Finance; May 2, 2017,
 reported favorably by the following vote:  Yeas 14, Nays 0;
 May 2, 2017, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the effect of a sale of property on the tax lien on the
 property to secure the payment of taxes, penalties, and interest
 imposed on the property as a result of the addition to the appraisal
 roll of property or appraised value that was erroneously exempted
 in a prior year.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 11.43, Tax Code, is amended by adding
 Subsection (i-1) to read as follows:
 (i-1)  If the chief appraiser adds property or appraised
 value that was erroneously exempted in a prior year to the appraisal
 roll as required by Subsection (i), a tax lien may not be enforced
 against the property to secure the payment of any taxes, penalties,
 or interest imposed for that year on the property as a result of the
 addition of the property or appraised value if at any time after
 January 1 of that year the property was sold in an arm's length
 transaction to a person who was not related to the seller within the
 first degree by consanguinity or affinity, as determined under
 Chapter 573, Government Code.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2017.
 * * * * *