Texas 2017 85th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1780 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 04/19/2017

                    By: Zaffirini S.B. No. 1780
 (In the Senate - Filed March 9, 2017; March 23, 2017, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Intergovernmental
 Relations; April 19, 2017, reported favorably by the following
 vote:  Yeas 5, Nays 2; April 19, 2017, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the amount of compensation and allowances of a county
 auditor in certain counties.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 152.032(d), Local Government Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 (d)  The amount of the compensation and allowances of a
 county auditor in a county subject to this subsection may be set in
 an amount that exceeds the limit established by Subsection (a) if
 the compensation and allowances are approved by the commissioners
 court of the county. This subsection applies only to:
 (1)  a county with a population of more than 108,000 and
 less than 110,000;
 (2)  a county with a population of 120,000 or more,
 excluding a county subject to Subsection (b);
 (3)  a county with a population of more than 1,000 and
 less than 23,000 that borders the Gulf of Mexico; [and]
 (4)  a county with a population of more than 11,000 and
 less than 11,650; and
 (5)  a county that:
 (A)  borders a county with a population of more
 than one million; and
 (B)  has a population of more than 36,000 and less
 than 40,000.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2017.
 * * * * *