Texas 2017 85th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1794 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 05/03/2017

                    By: Menéndez S.B. No. 1794
 (In the Senate - Filed March 9, 2017; March 23, 2017, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Education; May 3, 2017,
 reported favorably by the following vote:  Yeas 11, Nays 0;
 May 3, 2017, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the elimination of a specific requirement that certain
 school districts develop and implement a plan to increase
 enrollment of the district's students at institutions of higher
 education.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 29.904, Education Code, is repealed.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2017.
 * * * * *